VA SB1360 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on January 12 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-02-06 - Left in Judiciary
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 12 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-02-06 - Left in Judiciary
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Virginia Human Rights Act; nondiscrimination in employment; sexual harassment and workplace harassment. Clarifies, by defining sexual harassment and workplace harassment, what constitutes an unlawful employment practice if engaged in by an employer. The bill also provides (i) a nonexhaustive list of factors to consider when determining whether certain conduct constitutes workplace harassment, (ii) that a person claiming to be aggrieved by an unlawful discriminatory practice may file a written complaint with the Division of Human Rights within two years after the occurrence of the alleged unlawful discriminatory practice, and (iii) that an aggrieved person who has been provided a notice of his right to file a civil action for such grievance may do so within one year of receiving such notice and may be awarded reasonable attorney fees, including costs and reasonable litigation expenses if the court or jury finds in his favor. The bill also amends the definition of "employer" to mean a person employing five or more employees, instead of 15 or more employees under current law, for each working day in each of 20 or more calendar weeks in the current or preceding calendar year, and any agent of such a person.
Title
Virginia Human Rights Act; nondiscrimination in employment, sexual harassment.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-02-05 - Senate - Senate: Motion to recommit to committee agreed to (20-Y 18-N) (Y: 20 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-03 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Judiciary with amendment (9-Y 6-N) (Y: 9 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-03 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance and Appropriations with amendment (12-Y 4-N) (Y: 12 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-27 - Senate - Senate: Reported from General Laws and Technology with substitute (10-Y 1-N 3-A) (Y: 10 N: 1 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-03 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Judiciary with amendment (9-Y 6-N) (Y: 9 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-03 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance and Appropriations with amendment (12-Y 4-N) (Y: 12 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-27 - Senate - Senate: Reported from General Laws and Technology with substitute (10-Y 1-N 3-A) (Y: 10 N: 1 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-02-06 | Senate | Left in Judiciary |
2021-02-05 | Senate | Recommitted to Judiciary |
2021-02-05 | Senate | Motion to recommit to committee agreed to (20-Y 18-N) |
2021-02-05 | Senate | Read second time |
2021-02-04 | Senate | Read first time |
2021-02-03 | Senate | Reported from Judiciary with amendments (9-Y 6-N) |
2021-02-03 | Senate | Rereferred to Judiciary |
2021-02-03 | Senate | Reported from Finance and Appropriations with amendment (12-Y 4-N) |
2021-01-27 | Senate | Rereferred to Finance and Appropriations |
2021-01-27 | Senate | Reported from General Laws and Technology with substitute (10-Y 1-N 3-A) |
2021-01-27 | Senate | Committee substitute printed 21103514D-S1 |
2021-01-12 | Senate | Referred to Committee on General Laws and Technology |
2021-01-12 | Senate | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/13/21 21102590D |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
2 | 2 | 3902 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
2 | 2 | 3905 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
2 | 2 | 3905.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
2 | 2 | 3908 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
2 | 2 | 522 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |