VA SB135 | 2020 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future SB135
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on December 18 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-04 - Continued to 2021 in Finance and Appropriations (14-Y 0-N)
Pending: Senate Finance and Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on December 18 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-04 - Continued to 2021 in Finance and Appropriations (14-Y 0-N)
Pending: Senate Finance and Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Children's Services Act; special education programs. Expands eligibility for services under the Children's Services Act to students who transfer from an approved private school special education program to a public school special education program established and funded jointly by a local governing body and school division located within Planning District 16 for the purpose of providing special education and related services when (i) the public school special education program is able to provide services comparable to those of an approved private school special education program and (ii) the student would require placement in an approved private school special education program but for the availability of the public school special education program.
Title
Children's Services Act; special education programs.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-02-04 - Senate - Senate: Continued to 2021 in Finance and Appropriations (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-23 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-23 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-04 | Senate | Continued to 2021 in Finance and Appropriations (14-Y 0-N) |
2020-01-23 | Senate | Rereferred to Finance and Appropriations |
2020-01-23 | Senate | Reported from Education and Health (15-Y 0-N) |
2020-01-14 | Senate | Assigned Education sub: Public Education |
2019-12-18 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Education and Health |
2019-12-18 | Senate | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/20 20101400D |
Same As/Similar To
SB135 (Carry Over) 2020-02-04 - Continued to 2021 in Finance and Appropriations (14-Y 0-N)