VA SB1342 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 5 2015 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-02-24 - Left in Appropriations
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 5 2015 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-02-24 - Left in Appropriations
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Residential Improved Accessibility and Universal Visitability Grant Program. Establishes a grant program for homeowners and contractors for the purchase or construction of new residences or renovations to existing residences designed to improve accessibility or to provide universal visitability. The grant program would be administered by the Director of the Department of Housing and Community Development. Subject to the appropriation of funds by the General Assembly, the Director would be authorized to award up to $1 million in grants each fiscal year beginning with fiscal year 2016, of which the Director would allocate 50 percent for the purchase or construction of new residences and 50 percent for the retrofitting or renovation of existing residences. The maximum grant allowed would be (i) $5,000 for the purchase or construction of a new residence or (ii) 50 percent of the amount expended, but not to exceed $5,000, for the retrofitting or renovation of an existing residence.
Title
Residential Improved Accessibility and Universal Visitability Grant Fund and Program; established.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-02-17 - House - House: Reported from General Laws (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-17 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (6-Y 0-N) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-05 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (37-Y 0-N) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-05 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-04 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (37-Y 0-N) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-02 - Senate - Senate: Reported from General Laws and Technology (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-17 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (6-Y 0-N) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-05 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (37-Y 0-N) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-05 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-04 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (37-Y 0-N) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-02 - Senate - Senate: Reported from General Laws and Technology (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-02-24 | House | Left in Appropriations |
2015-02-20 | House | Subcommittee recommends laying on the table by voice vote |
2015-02-18 | House | Assigned App. sub: Agriculture, Commerce, Technology and Natural Resources |
2015-02-17 | House | Referred to Committee on Appropriations |
2015-02-17 | House | Reported from General Laws (21-Y 0-N) |
2015-02-17 | House | Subcommittee recommends referring to Committee on Appropriations |
2015-02-17 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting (6-Y 0-N) |
2015-02-11 | House | Assigned GL sub: Subcommittee #1 |
2015-02-09 | House | Referred to Committee on General Laws |
2015-02-09 | House | Read first time |
2015-02-09 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2015-02-05 | Senate | Passed Senate (37-Y 0-N) |
2015-02-05 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) |
2015-02-05 | Senate | Read second time and engrossed |
2015-02-04 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (37-Y 0-N) |
2015-02-02 | Senate | Reported from General Laws and Technology (15-Y 0-N) |
2015-01-19 | Senate | Referred to Committee on General Laws and Technology |
2015-01-19 | Senate | Presented and ordered printed 15103067D |