VA SB134 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on January 15 2018 - 50% progression
Action: 2018-01-16 - Requires 32 affirmative votes for passage
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]

Summary

Certain hospital licenses; effective date. Provides that a license issued to an acute care hospital located in Patrick County that was valid on September 1, 2017, and remained valid on December 31, 2017, despite the closure of such hospital prior to December 31, 2017, shall continue to remain valid until December 31, 2018. This bill is effective retroactively to December 31, 2017. The bill contains an emergency clause.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Hospital licenses, certain; effective date.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-01-16 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and defeated by Senate (30-Y 10-N) (Y: 30 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-12 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-11 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health (14-Y 0-N 1-A) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-01-16SenateRequires 32 affirmative votes for passage
2018-01-16SenateRead third time and defeated by Senate (30-Y 10-N)
2018-01-15SenateRead second time and engrossed
2018-01-12SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
2018-01-11SenateReported from Education and Health (14-Y 0-N 1-A)
2017-12-20SenateReferred to Committee on Education and Health
2017-12-20SenatePrefiled and ordered printed with emergency clause; offered 01/10/18 18101666D

Virginia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback