VA SB1338 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 12 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-02-22 - House: Left in Appropriations
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 12 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-02-22 - House: Left in Appropriations
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Governor; submission of financial plan; Joint Legislative Audit and Review Commission. Provides for the Governor's financial plan to be submitted to the General Assembly before the first day of each legislative session and for the plan to prospectively cover periods of six and 10 years. Under current law the plan is required to be submitted in even-numbered years and to cover a prospective period of six years. The bill also provides for the plan to include projections for total state indebtedness, projected future expenditures for debt service over time, and other relevant measures of debt. The plan must be updated within 60 days of the adoption of the state budget. The bill further provides for the Joint Legislative Audit and Review Commission to include a six-year projection of expenditures in programs identified as the largest and fastest growing programs in the Commission's annual report on state spending.
Title
Governor; submission of financial plan to General Assembly.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-02-08 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-08 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-07 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-04 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Rules (16-Y 0-N) (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-08 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-07 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-04 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Rules (16-Y 0-N) (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-02-22 | House: Left in Appropriations | |
2011-02-15 | House: Assigned App. sub: Technology Oversight and Government Activities | |
2011-02-09 | House: Referred to Committee on Appropriations | |
2011-02-09 | House: Read first time | |
2011-02-09 | House: Placed on Calendar | |
2011-02-08 | Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) | |
2011-02-08 | Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) | |
2011-02-08 | Senate: Read second time and engrossed | |
2011-02-07 | Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) | |
2011-02-04 | Senate: Reported from Rules (16-Y 0-N) | |
2011-01-26 | Senate: Assigned Rules sub: #1 | |
2011-01-12 | Senate: Referred to Committee on Rules | |
2011-01-12 | Senate: Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/12/11 11103917D |