VA SB1333 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 2 2023 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-02-17 - Tabled in Appropriations (12-Y 9-N)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 2 2023 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-02-17 - Tabled in Appropriations (12-Y 9-N)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Solar and energy efficiency projects for low-income and moderate-income Virginians. Allows the Clean Energy Advisory Board to advise the Director of Department of Energy (Director) to apply to certain federal loan guarantees or grant funds to facilitate the development of solar energy, storage, and energy efficiency projects. The bill expands the Low to Moderate Income Solar Loan and Rebate Fund to extend grants in addition to loans or paying rebates to electric customers who complete solar installations or energy efficiency improvements subject to certain requirements provided in the bill. The bill adds an additional criteria for an applicant of the Low to Moderate Income Solar Pilot Program to satisfy in order to be eligible for a grant, loan, or rebate. Finally, the bill extends the time that the Director is required to respond to an application of such program from 30 to 60 days. Solar and energy efficiency projects for low-income and moderate-income Virginians. Allows the Clean Energy Advisory Board to advise the Director of Department of Energy (Director) to apply to certain federal loan guarantees or grant funds to facilitate the development of solar energy, storage, and energy efficiency projects. The bill expands the Low to Moderate Income Solar Loan and Rebate Fund to extend grants in addition to loans or paying rebates to electric customers who complete solar installations or energy efficiency improvements subject to certain requirements provided in the bill. The bill adds an additional criteria for an applicant of the Low to Moderate Income Solar Pilot Program to satisfy in order to be eligible for a grant, loan, or rebate. Finally, the bill extends the time that the Director is required to respond to an application of such program from 30 to 60 days.
Title
Commonwealth Solar and Economic Development Program; created.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-02-17 - House - House: Tabled in Appropriations (12-Y 9-N) (Y: 12 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-02-15 - House - House: Reported from Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources (14-Y 6-N) (Y: 14 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-02-15 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (6-Y 0-N) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-03 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (26-Y 13-N) (Y: 26 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-02-01 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-01-31 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance and Appropriations (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-01-17 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources with substitite (13-Y 1-N 1-A) (Y: 13 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-15 - House - House: Reported from Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources (14-Y 6-N) (Y: 14 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-02-15 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (6-Y 0-N) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-03 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (26-Y 13-N) (Y: 26 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-02-01 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-01-31 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance and Appropriations (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-01-17 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources with substitite (13-Y 1-N 1-A) (Y: 13 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-02-17 | House | Tabled in Appropriations (12-Y 9-N) |
2023-02-15 | House | Referred to Committee on Appropriations |
2023-02-15 | House | Reported from Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources (14-Y 6-N) |
2023-02-15 | House | Subcommittee recommends referring to Committee on Appropriations |
2023-02-15 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting (6-Y 0-N) |
2023-02-10 | House | Assigned ACNR sub: Natural Resources |
2023-02-10 | House | Referred to Committee on Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources |
2023-02-10 | House | Read first time |
2023-02-10 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2023-02-03 | Senate | Read third time and passed Senate (26-Y 13-N) |
2023-02-02 | Senate | Printed as engrossed 23104715D-ES1 |
2023-02-02 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute with amendment SB1333ES1 |
2023-02-02 | Senate | Amendment by Senator Hashmi agreed to |
2023-02-02 | Senate | Reading of amendment waived |
2023-02-02 | Senate | Committee substitute agreed to 23104715D-S1 |
2023-02-02 | Senate | Reading of substitute waived |
2023-02-02 | Senate | Read second time |
2023-02-01 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2023-01-31 | Senate | Reported from Finance and Appropriations (15-Y 0-N) |
2023-01-17 | Senate | Rereferred to Finance and Appropriations |
2023-01-17 | Senate | Committee substitute printed 23104715D-S1 |
2023-01-17 | Senate | Reported from Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources with substitite (13-Y 1-N 1-A) |
2023-01-11 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources |
2023-01-11 | Senate | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/11/23 23104268D |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
45 | 2 | 1701 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
45 | 2 | 1905 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
45 | 2 | 1918 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
45 | 2 | 1925 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |