VA SB1331 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Enrolled on February 23 2019 - 75% progression
Action: 2019-03-04 - Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, March 26, 2019
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Modernization of public school buildings and facilities. Provides that it is the legislative intent that public school buildings and facilities be designed, constructed, maintained, and operated to generate more electricity than consumed, and allows local school boards to enter into leases with private entities to achieve that goal if the school board owns or operates a school building or facility that has been properly modernized, generates energy derived from sunlight, and if the solar generating facility is properly interconnected. The bill also provides that private entities that contract with local school boards to modernize public school buildings and facilities may receive financing from the Virginia Small Business Financing Authority. This bill is identical to HB 2192. Modernization of public school buildings and facilities. Provides that it is the legislative intent that public school buildings and facilities be designed, constructed, maintained, and operated to generate more electricity than consumed, and allows local school boards to enter into leases with private entities to achieve that goal if the school board owns or operates a school building or facility that has been properly modernized, generates energy derived from sunlight, and if the solar generating facility is properly interconnected. The bill also provides that private entities that contract with local school boards to modernize public school buildings and facilities may receive financing from the Virginia Small Business Financing Authority. This bill is identical to HB 2192.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Public school buildings and facilities; modernization.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-02-20 - Senate - Senate: House substitute agreed to by Senate (39-Y 1-N) (Y: 39 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-19 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE #2 (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-19 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-14 - House - House: Reported from General Laws with substitute (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-05 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (39-Y 1-N) (Y: 39 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-05 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-04 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-31 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance (16-Y 0-N) (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-31 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health with substitute (13-Y 1-N) (Y: 13 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-04 Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, March 26, 2019
2019-03-04SenateEnrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on March 4, 2019
2019-02-23HouseSigned by Speaker
2019-02-23SenateSigned by President
2019-02-23SenateBill text as passed Senate and House (SB1331ER)
2019-02-23SenateEnrolled
2019-02-20SenateTitle replaced 19106668D-H1
2019-02-20SenateHouse substitute agreed to by Senate (39-Y 1-N)
2019-02-19HouseVOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE #2 (99-Y 0-N)
2019-02-19HousePassed House with substitute BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N)
2019-02-19HouseReconsideration of House passage agreed to by House
2019-02-19HouseVOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N)
2019-02-19HousePassed House with substitute BLOCK VOTE (98-Y 0-N)
2019-02-19HouseEngrossed by House - committee substitute SB1331H1
2019-02-19HouseCommittee substitute agreed to 19106668D-H1
2019-02-19HouseRead third time
2019-02-18HouseRead second time
2019-02-14HouseCommittee substitute printed 19106668D-H1
2019-02-14HouseReported from General Laws with substitute (22-Y 0-N)
2019-02-08HouseReferred to Committee on General Laws
2019-02-08HouseRead first time
2019-02-08HousePlaced on Calendar
2019-02-05SenatePassed Senate (39-Y 1-N)
2019-02-05SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
2019-02-05SenateEngrossed by Senate - committee substitute SB1331S1
2019-02-05SenateCommittee substitute agreed to 19105740D-S1
2019-02-05SenateReading of substitute waived
2019-02-05SenateRead second time
2019-02-04SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
2019-01-31SenateReported from Finance (16-Y 0-N)
2019-01-31SenateRereferred to Finance
2019-01-31SenateCommittee substitute printed 19105740D-S1
2019-01-31SenateReported from Education and Health with substitute (13-Y 1-N)
2019-01-08SenateReferred to Committee on Education and Health
2019-01-08SenatePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/19 19102737D

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
224303(n/a)See Bill Text
221141.1(n/a)See Bill Text
221141.2(n/a)See Bill Text
621198(n/a)See Bill Text
621199(n/a)See Bill Text
621218.1(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+sum+SB1331
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+SB1331+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+SB1331S1+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+SB1331H1+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+SB1331ER+hil
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+S04V0162+SB1331
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+S05V0235+SB1331
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+SV0353SB1331+SB1331
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+SV0418SB1331+SB1331
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+SV0423SB1331+SB1331
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+H11V0252+SB1331
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+HV2943+SB1331
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+HV2986+SB1331
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+SV0872SB1331+SB1331

Bill Comments

feedback