VA SB1331 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 23 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-02-23 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0166)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 23 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-02-23 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0166)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Department of Transportation; Office of Intermodal Planning and Investment of the Secretary of Transportation; responsibilities. Shifts responsibilities for transportation planning activities from the Virginia Department of Transportation (VDOT) to the Office of Intermodal Planning and Investment of the Secretary of Transportation. The bill specifies VDOT's core functions and limits the agency's duties to those core functions. The bill requires transparency in the development of the Six-Year Improvement Program and State of Good Repair Program by the Commonwealth Transportation Board (CTB) and requires the CTB and VDOT to make public certain information related to the selection of projects. This bill is identical to HB 2241.
Title
Transportation planning activities; responsibility of Office of Intermodal Planning and Investment.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-02-13 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (97-Y 0-N) (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-09 - House - House: Reported from Transportation (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-31 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-27 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-25 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Transportation with substitute (13-Y 0-N) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-09 - House - House: Reported from Transportation (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-31 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-27 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-25 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Transportation with substitute (13-Y 0-N) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-02-23 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0166) | |
2017-02-23 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 166 (effective 7/1/17) | |
2017-02-17 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, February 24, 2017 | |
2017-02-17 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on 2/17/17 |
2017-02-17 | Senate | Signed by President |
2017-02-15 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2017-02-15 | Senate | Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB1331ER) |
2017-02-15 | Senate | Enrolled |
2017-02-13 | House | VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (97-Y 0-N) |
2017-02-13 | House | Passed House BLOCK VOTE (97-Y 0-N) |
2017-02-13 | House | Read third time |
2017-02-10 | House | Read second time |
2017-02-09 | House | Reported from Transportation (22-Y 0-N) |
2017-02-03 | House | Referred to Committee on Transportation |
2017-02-03 | House | Read first time |
2017-02-03 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2017-01-31 | Senate | Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2017-01-30 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute SB1331S1 |
2017-01-30 | Senate | Committee substitute agreed to 17104634D-S1 |
2017-01-30 | Senate | Reading of substitute waived |
2017-01-30 | Senate | Read second time |
2017-01-27 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) |
2017-01-25 | Senate | Committee substitute printed 17104634D-S1 |
2017-01-25 | Senate | Reported from Transportation with substitute (13-Y 0-N) |
2017-01-10 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Transportation |
2017-01-10 | Senate | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/11/17 17103827D |
Subjects
Administration of Government
Highways and Other Surface Transportation Systems
Transportation Secretary of
Highways and Other Surface Transportation Systems
Transportation Secretary of
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
2 | 2 | 229 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
33 | 2 | 214 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
33 | 2 | 214.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
33 | 2 | 214.2 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
33 | 2 | 222 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
33 | 2 | 256 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |