VA SB1328 | 2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future SB1328
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on January 28 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-02-08 - Continued to Special Session 1 in Health, Welfare and Institutions by voice vote
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on January 28 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-02-08 - Continued to Special Session 1 in Health, Welfare and Institutions by voice vote
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
State-Funded Kinship Guardianship Assistance program. Creates the State-Funded Kinship Guardianship Assistance program (the program) to facilitate child placements with relatives, including fictive kin, and ensure permanency for children. The bill sets forth eligibility criteria for the program, payment allowances to kinship guardians, and requirements for kinship guardianship assistance agreements. State-Funded Kinship Guardianship Assistance program. Creates the State-Funded Kinship Guardianship Assistance program (the program) to facilitate child placements with relatives, including fictive kin, and ensure permanency for children. The bill sets forth eligibility criteria for the program, payment allowances to kinship guardians, and requirements for kinship guardianship assistance agreements.
Title
State-Funded Kinship Guardianship Assistance program; created.
Sponsors
Sen. Monty Mason [D] |
Roll Calls
2021-01-29 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (37-Y 0-N) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-01-27 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-26 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance and Appropriations with amendments (16-Y 0-N) (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-15 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Rehabilitation and Social Services with substitute (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-27 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-26 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance and Appropriations with amendments (16-Y 0-N) (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-15 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Rehabilitation and Social Services with substitute (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-02-08 | House | Continued to Special Session 1 in Health, Welfare and Institutions by voice vote |
2021-02-02 | House | Referred to Committee on Health, Welfare and Institutions |
2021-02-02 | House | Read first time |
2021-02-02 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2021-01-29 | Senate | Read third time and passed Senate (37-Y 0-N) |
2021-01-28 | Senate | Printed as engrossed 21103088D-ES1 |
2021-01-28 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute with amendments SB1328ES1 |
2021-01-28 | Senate | Committee amendments agreed to |
2021-01-28 | Senate | Reading of amendments waived |
2021-01-28 | Senate | Committee substitute agreed to 21103088D-S1 |
2021-01-28 | Senate | Reading of substitute waived |
2021-01-28 | Senate | Read second time |
2021-01-27 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) |
2021-01-26 | Senate | Reported from Finance and Appropriations with amendments (16-Y 0-N) |
2021-01-15 | Senate | Rereferred to Finance and Appropriations |
2021-01-15 | Senate | Committee substitute printed 21103088D-S1 |
2021-01-15 | Senate | Reported from Rehabilitation and Social Services with substitute (14-Y 0-N) |
2021-01-12 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Rehabilitation and Social Services |
2021-01-12 | Senate | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/13/21 21101857D |
Same As/Similar To
SB1328 (Carry Over) 2021-02-08 - Continued to Special Session 1 in Health, Welfare and Institutions by voice vote
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
16 | 1 | 282.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
63 | 2 | 100 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
63 | 2 | 1305 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
63 | 2 | 1306 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
63 | 2 | 905 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
63 | 2 | 906 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |