VA SB1324 | 2017 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Vetoed on March 23 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-05 - Requires 27 affirmative votes to override veto
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Religious freedom; solemnization of marriage. Provides that no person shall be (i) required to participate in the solemnization of any marriage or (ii) subject to any penalty by the Commonwealth, or its political subdivisions or representatives or agents, solely on account of such person's belief, speech, or action in accordance with a sincerely held religious belief or moral conviction that marriage is or should be recognized as the union of one man and one woman. The bill defines "person" as any (a) religious organization; (b) organization supervised by or controlled by or operated in connection with a religious organization; (c) individual employed by a religious organization while acting in the scope of his paid or volunteer employment; (d) successor, representative, agent, agency, or instrumentality of any of the foregoing; or (e) clergy member or minister. The bill also defines "penalty." This bill is identical to HB 2025.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Religious freedom; definitions, marriage solemnization, participation, and beliefs.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-04-05 - Senate - Senate: Senate sustained Governor's veto (21-Y 19-N) (Y: 21 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-05 - Senate - Senate: Reconsideration of Governor's veto agreed to (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-05 - Senate - Senate: Senate sustained Governor's veto (20-Y 20-N) (Y: 20 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2017-02-24 - House - House: VOTE: ADOPTION (57-Y 38-N) (Y: 57 N: 38 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-24 - Senate - Senate: Conference report agreed to by Senate (21-Y 19-N) (Y: 21 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-24 - Senate - Senate: Reconsideration of conference report agreed to by Senate (39-Y 1-N) (Y: 39 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-24 - Senate - Senate: Conference report agreed to by Senate (20-Y 19-N) (Y: 20 N: 19 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2017-02-23 - Senate - Senate: Senate acceded to request (35-Y 4-N) (Y: 35 N: 4 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-22 - Senate - Senate: House amendment rejected by Senate (0-Y 40-N) (Y: 0 N: 40 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2017-02-21 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (55-Y 41-N) (Y: 55 N: 41 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-16 - House - House: Reported from General Laws with amendments (12-Y 7-N) (Y: 12 N: 7 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-07 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (21-Y 19-N) (Y: 21 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-07 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-06 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-03 - Senate - Senate: Reported from General Laws and Technology with amendment (8-Y 6-N) (Y: 8 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-04-05SenateRequires 27 affirmative votes to override veto
2017-04-05SenateSenate sustained Governor's veto (21-Y 19-N)
2017-04-05SenateReconsideration of Governor's veto agreed to (40-Y 0-N)
2017-04-05SenateRequires 27 affirmative votes to override veto
2017-04-05SenateSenate sustained Governor's veto (20-Y 20-N)
2017-03-23 Governor: Vetoed by Governor
2017-03-13 Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, March 27, 2017
2017-03-13SenateEnrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on 3/13/17
2017-03-10SenateSigned by President
2017-03-07HouseSigned by Speaker
2017-03-07SenateBill text as passed Senate and House (SB1324ER)
2017-03-07SenateEnrolled
2017-02-24HouseVOTE: ADOPTION (57-Y 38-N)
2017-02-24HouseConference report agreed to by House (57-Y 38-N)
2017-02-24SenateConference report agreed to by Senate (21-Y 19-N)
2017-02-24SenateReconsideration of conference report agreed to by Senate (39-Y 1-N)
2017-02-24SenateConference report agreed to by Senate (20-Y 19-N)
2017-02-23HouseDelegates: Freitas, Gilbert, Bell, John J.
2017-02-23HouseConferees appointed by House
2017-02-23SenateSenators: Carrico, Reeves, Barker
2017-02-23SenateConferees appointed by Senate
2017-02-23SenateSenate acceded to request (35-Y 4-N)
2017-02-23HouseHouse requested conference committee
2017-02-23HouseHouse insisted on amendment
2017-02-22SenateHouse amendment rejected by Senate (0-Y 40-N)
2017-02-21HouseVOTE: PASSAGE (55-Y 41-N)
2017-02-21HousePassed House with amendment (55-Y 41-N)
2017-02-21HouseEngrossed by House as amended
2017-02-21HouseCommittee amendment agreed to
2017-02-21HouseRead third time
2017-02-20HouseRead second time
2017-02-16HouseReported from General Laws with amendment (12-Y 7-N)
2017-02-09HouseReferred to Committee on General Laws
2017-02-09HouseRead first time
2017-02-09HousePlaced on Calendar
2017-02-07SenatePassed Senate (21-Y 19-N)
2017-02-07SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
2017-02-07SenatePrinted as engrossed 17102265D-E
2017-02-07SenateEngrossed by Senate as amended SB1324E
2017-02-07SenateCommittee amendment agreed to
2017-02-07SenateReading of amendment waived
2017-02-07SenateRead second time
2017-02-06SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
2017-02-03SenateReported from General Laws and Technology with amendment (8-Y 6-N)
2017-01-10SenateReferred to Committee on General Laws and Technology
2017-01-10SenatePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/11/17 17102265D

Subjects


Virginia State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?171+sum+SB1324
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?171+ful+SB1324+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?171+ful+SB1324E+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?171+ful+SB1324ER+hil
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?171+vot+S12V0090+SB1324
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?171+vot+SV0331SB1324+SB1324
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?171+vot+SV0393SB1324+SB1324
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?171+vot+SV0397SB1324+SB1324
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?171+vot+H11V0252+SB1324
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?171+vot+HV2555+SB1324
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?171+vot+SV0839SB1324+SB1324
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?171+vot+SV0956SB1324+SB1324
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?171+vot+SV1039SB1324+SB1324
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?171+vot+SV1040SB1324+SB1324
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?171+vot+SV1041SB1324+SB1324
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?171+vot+HV2807+SB1324
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?171+vot+SV1128SB1324+SB1324
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?171+vot+SV1129SB1324+SB1324
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?171+vot+SV1130SB1324+SB1324

Bill Comments

feedback