VA SB1323 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on March 27 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-03-27 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0728)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on March 27 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-03-27 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0728)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Electric utilities; energy efficiency savings targets. Requires the State Corporation Commission to establish for Dominion Energy Virginia annual energy efficiency savings targets for customers who are low-income, elderly, disabled, or veterans of military service. The bill requires the Commission, in establishing such targets, to seek to optimize energy efficiency and the health and safety benefits of utility energy efficiency programs. The bill requires Dominion Energy Virginia to make best efforts to coordinate such energy efficiency programs with any health and safety upgrades provided through energy efficiency programs authorized by provisions of the Code of Virginia, when reasonably feasible to do so and at the utility's sole discretion. The bill has an expiration date of January 1, 2031.
Title
Electric utilities; energy efficiency savings targets.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-02-21 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (96-Y 2-N) (Y: 96 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-02-16 - House - House: Reported from Commerce and Energy (19-Y 2-N) (Y: 19 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-02-03 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-02-01 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-01-30 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Commerce and Labor with amendments (14-Y 1-N) (Y: 14 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-16 - House - House: Reported from Commerce and Energy (19-Y 2-N) (Y: 19 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-02-03 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-02-01 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-01-30 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Commerce and Labor with amendments (14-Y 1-N) (Y: 14 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-03-27 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0728) | |
2023-03-27 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 728 (effective 7/1/23) | |
2023-03-02 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., March 27, 2023 | |
2023-03-02 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on March 2, 2023 |
2023-02-24 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2023-02-24 | Senate | Signed by President |
2023-02-24 | Senate | Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB1323ER) |
2023-02-24 | Senate | Enrolled |
2023-02-21 | House | VOTE: Passage (96-Y 2-N) |
2023-02-21 | House | Passed House (96-Y 2-N) |
2023-02-21 | House | Read third time |
2023-02-20 | House | Read second time |
2023-02-16 | House | Reported from Commerce and Energy (19-Y 2-N) |
2023-02-10 | House | Referred to Committee on Commerce and Energy |
2023-02-10 | House | Read first time |
2023-02-10 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2023-02-03 | Senate | Read third time and passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) |
2023-02-02 | Senate | Printed as engrossed 23102355D-E |
2023-02-02 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate as amended SB1323E |
2023-02-02 | Senate | Committee amendments agreed to |
2023-02-02 | Senate | Reading of amendments waived |
2023-02-02 | Senate | Read second time |
2023-02-01 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2023-01-30 | Senate | Reported from Commerce and Labor with amendments (14-Y 1-N) |
2023-01-24 | Senate | Assigned C&L sub: Energy |
2023-01-10 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor |
2023-01-10 | Senate | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/11/23 23102355D |