VA SB1313 | 2021 | 1st Special Session

Note: Carryover of previous SB1313

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on March 11 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-11 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0071)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Children's Services Act; special education programs. Requires that funds expended for private special education services under the Children's Services Act only be expended on educational programs that are licensed by the Board of Education or an equivalent out-of-state licensing agency. The bill also provides that as of July 1, 2022, such funds may only be expended for programs that the Office of Children's Services certify as having reported their tuition rates. Children's Services Act; special education programs. Requires that funds expended for private special education services under the Children's Services Act only be expended on educational programs that are licensed by the Board of Education or an equivalent out-of-state licensing agency. The bill also provides that as of July 1, 2022, such funds may only be expended for programs that the Office of Children's Services certify as having reported their tuition rates. The bill adds children and youth previously placed in approved private school educational programs for at least six months who will receive transitional services in a public school setting to the target population for eligibility for the state pool of funds. The bill provides that state funds shall be allocated for no longer than 12 months for transitional services. The bill requires the Secretaries of Education and Health and Human Resources, in conjunction with the Office of Children's Services and the Department of Education, to establish a work group with appropriate stakeholders to develop a detailed plan to direct the transfer of Children's Services Act funds currently reserved for children requiring an educational placement in a private special education day school or residential facility to the Department of Education, as well as several other topics. The bill requires that the work group submit its plan and recommendations to the Chairmen of the House Committee on Appropriations and Senate Committee on Finance and Appropriations by November 1, 2021, as well as a final plan and recommendations by November 1, 2022.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Children's Services Act; funds expended special education programs.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-02-22 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (97-Y 2-N) (Y: 97 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-17 - House - House: Reported from Education (21-Y 1-N) (Y: 21 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-15 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-04 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-04 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-03 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-03 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance and Appropriations with substitute (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-21 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health with substitute (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-03-11 Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0071)
2021-03-11 Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 71 (effective 7/1/21)
2021-03-01 Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., March 31, 2021
2021-03-01SenateEnrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on March 1, 2021
2021-02-25HouseSigned by Speaker
2021-02-24SenateSigned by President
2021-02-24SenateBill text as passed Senate and House (SB1313ER)
2021-02-24SenateEnrolled
2021-02-22HouseVOTE: Passage (97-Y 2-N)
2021-02-22HousePassed House (97-Y 2-N)
2021-02-22HouseRead third time
2021-02-19HouseRead second time
2021-02-17HouseReported from Education (21-Y 1-N)
2021-02-15HouseSubcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N)
2021-02-08HouseContinued to Special Session 1 in Education by voice vote
2021-02-07HouseReferred to Committee on Education
2021-02-07HouseRead first time
2021-02-07HousePlaced on Calendar
2021-02-04SenatePassed Senate (39-Y 0-N)
2021-02-04SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N)
2021-02-04SenateEngrossed by Senate - committee substitute SB1313S2
2021-02-04SenateCommittee substitute agreed to 21104193D-S2
2021-02-04SenateReading of substitute waived
2021-02-04SenateCommittee substitute rejected 21103505D-S1
2021-02-04SenateReading of substitute waived
2021-02-04SenateRead second time
2021-02-03SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
2021-02-03SenateCommittee substitute printed 21104193D-S2
2021-02-03SenateReported from Finance and Appropriations with substitute (15-Y 0-N)
2021-01-21SenateRereferred to Finance and Appropriations
2021-01-21SenateCommittee substitute printed 21103505D-S1
2021-01-21SenateIncorporates SB1114 (Peake)
2021-01-21SenateIncorporates SB1099 (Stuart)
2021-01-21SenateReported from Education and Health with substitute (14-Y 0-N)
2021-01-13SenateAssigned Education sub: Public Education
2021-01-12SenateReferred to Committee on Education and Health
2021-01-12SenatePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/13/21 21102548D

Same As/Similar To

SB1313 (Carry Over) 2021-02-08 - Continued to Special Session 1 in Education by voice vote
HB2117 (Same As) 2021-03-11 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0070)

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
225211(n/a)See Bill Text
225212(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+sum+SB1313
Texthttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+ful+SB1313+hil
Texthttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+ful+SB1313S1+hil
Texthttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+ful+SB1313S2+hil
Texthttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+ful+SB1313ER+hil
Texthttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+ful+CHAP0071+hil
Supplementhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+oth+SB1313FS1122+PDF
Supplementhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+oth+SB1313FS2122+PDF
Supplementhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+oth+SB1313FER122+PDF
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+vot+S04C0025+SB1313
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+vot+S05C0120+SB1313
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+vot+SC0293SB1313+SB1313
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+vot+SC0304SB1313+SB1313
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+vot+SC0305SB1313+SB1313
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+vot+H0903V0003+SB1313
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+vot+H09V0016+SB1313
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+vot+HV1822+SB1313

Bill Comments 750

feedback