VA SB1308 | 2015 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 19 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-03-19 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0381)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Gas severance tax. Extends the sunset date from December 31, 2015, to January 1, 2018, for the local gas severance tax that is dedicated to (i) the local Coal and Gas Road Improvement Fund, (ii) the Virginia Coalfield Economic Development Fund, and (iii) water, sewer, and natural gas systems and lines.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Gas severance tax; extends sunset provision to December 31, 2018.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2015-02-17 - Senate - Senate: House substitute agreed to by Senate (37-Y 0-N) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-13 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (97-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-11 - House - House: Reported from Finance with substitute (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-26 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-22 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 1-N) (Y: 39 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-21 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2015-03-19 Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0381)
2015-03-19 Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 381 (effective 7/1/15)
2015-02-24 Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, Sunday, March 29, 2015
2015-02-24SenateEnrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on 2/24/15
2015-02-23SenateSigned by President
2015-02-20HouseSigned by Speaker
2015-02-20SenateBill text as passed Senate and House (SB1308ER)
2015-02-20SenateEnrolled
2015-02-17SenateTitle replaced 15105025D-H1
2015-02-17SenateHouse substitute agreed to by Senate (37-Y 0-N)
2015-02-13HouseVOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (97-Y 0-N)
2015-02-13HousePassed House with substitute BLOCK VOTE (97-Y 0-N)
2015-02-13HouseEngrossed by House - committee substitute SB1308H1
2015-02-13HouseCommittee substitute agreed to 15105025D-H1
2015-02-13HouseRead third time
2015-02-12HouseRead second time
2015-02-11HouseCommittee substitute printed 15105025D-H1
2015-02-11HouseReported from Finance with substitute (21-Y 0-N)
2015-01-30HouseReferred to Committee on Finance
2015-01-30HouseRead first time
2015-01-30HousePlaced on Calendar
2015-01-26SenateRead third time and passed Senate (39-Y 0-N)
2015-01-23SenateRead second time and engrossed
2015-01-22SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 1-N)
2015-01-21SenateReported from Finance (15-Y 0-N)
2015-01-14SenateReferred to Committee on Finance
2015-01-14SenatePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/14/15 15103669D

Same As/Similar To

HB1705 (Same As) 2015-03-17 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0271)

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
5813713(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?151+sum+SB1308
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?151+ful+SB1308+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?151+ful+SB1308H1+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?151+ful+SB1308ER+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?151+ful+CHAP0381+hil
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?151+vot+S05V0054+SB1308
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?151+vot+SV0072SB1308+SB1308
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?151+vot+SV0087SB1308+SB1308
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?151+vot+H10V0110+SB1308
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?151+vot+HV2301+SB1308
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?151+vot+SV0522SB1308+SB1308

Bill Comments

feedback