VA SB1303 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on January 26 2011 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-02-22 - House: VOTE: DEFEATED (19-Y 77-N)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on January 26 2011 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-02-22 - House: VOTE: DEFEATED (19-Y 77-N)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Air pollution; outdoor wood-burning heaters. Requires the Air Pollution Control Board to develop a model ordinance for localities that could be used, in the discretion of the locality, to regulate air pollution emissions resulting from the use of outdoor hydronic heaters such as residential wood-fired boilers.
Title
Air pollution; Board shall develop a model ordinance to regulate outdoor hydronic heaters, etc.
Sponsors
Sen. Frank Ruff [R] |
Roll Calls
2011-02-22 - House - House: VOTE: DEFEATED (19-Y 77-N) (Y: 19 N: 79 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2011-02-16 - House - House: Reported from Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources (18-Y 1-N) (Y: 19 N: 1 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-01-28 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (25-Y 14-N) (Y: 25 N: 14 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-01-25 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-01-24 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources with amendments (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-16 - House - House: Reported from Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources (18-Y 1-N) (Y: 19 N: 1 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-01-28 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (25-Y 14-N) (Y: 25 N: 14 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-01-25 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-01-24 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources with amendments (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-02-22 | House: VOTE: DEFEATED (19-Y 77-N) | |
2011-02-22 | House: Defeated by House (19-Y 77-N) | |
2011-02-22 | House: Read third time | |
2011-02-21 | House: Passed by for the day | |
2011-02-21 | House: Amendment by Delegate Morgan agreed to | |
2011-02-21 | House: Read third time | |
2011-02-18 | House: Passed by for the day | |
2011-02-17 | House: Read second time | |
2011-02-16 | House: Reported from Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources (18-Y 1-N) | |
2011-02-07 | House: Referred to Committee on Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources | |
2011-02-07 | House: Read first time | |
2011-02-07 | House: Placed on Calendar | |
2011-01-28 | Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (25-Y 14-N) | |
2011-01-27 | Senate: Passed by for the day | |
2011-01-26 | Senate: Printed as engrossed 11101663D-E | |
2011-01-26 | Senate: Engrossed by Senate as amended SB1303E | |
2011-01-26 | Senate: Committee amendments agreed to | |
2011-01-26 | Senate: Reading of amendments waived | |
2011-01-26 | Senate: Read second time | |
2011-01-25 | Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) | |
2011-01-24 | Senate: Reported from Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources with amendments (15-Y 0-N) | |
2011-01-12 | Senate: Referred to Committee on Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources | |
2011-01-12 | Senate: Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/12/11 11101663D |