VA SB1299 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on January 19 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-02-08 - Continued to Special Session 1 in General Laws by voice vote
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]

Summary

Alcoholic beverage control; sale and delivery of mixed beverages and pre-mixed wine for off-premises consumption. Allows distillers that have been appointed as agents of the Board of Directors (the Board) of the Virginia Alcoholic Beverage Control Authority (the Authority), mixed beverage restaurant licensees, and limited mixed beverage restaurant licensees to sell mixed beverages for off-premises consumption and deliver such mixed beverages to consumers subject to requirements set forth in the bill. The bill allows the Board to summarily revoke a licensee's privileges to sell and deliver mixed beverages for off-premises consumption for noncompliance with the requirements set forth in the bill or applicable provisions of current law. The bill also allows farm winery licensees to sell pre-mixed wine for off-premises consumption. The bill directs the Authority to convene a work group to study the sale and delivery of mixed beverages and pre-mixed wine for off-premises consumption and report its findings to the Chairmen of the House Committee on General Laws and the Senate Committee on Rehabilitation and Social Services by November 1, 2021. The provisions of the bill sunset on July 1, 2022.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Alcoholic beverage control; sale and delivery of mixed beverages and pre-mixed wine.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-01-20 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (38-Y 1-N) (Y: 38 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-15 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Rehabilitation and Social Services with substitute (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-02-08HouseContinued to Special Session 1 in General Laws by voice vote
2021-02-02HouseReferred to Committee on General Laws
2021-02-02HouseRead first time
2021-02-02HousePlaced on Calendar
2021-01-20SenateRead third time and passed Senate (38-Y 1-N)
2021-01-19SenateEngrossed by Senate - committee substitute SB1299S1
2021-01-19SenateCommittee substitute agreed to 21103122D-S1
2021-01-19SenateReading of substitute waived
2021-01-19SenateRead second time
2021-01-18SenateRead first time
2021-01-15SenateCommittee substitute printed 21103122D-S1
2021-01-15SenateIncorporates SB1388 (Reeves)
2021-01-15SenateReported from Rehabilitation and Social Services with substitute (14-Y 0-N)
2021-01-11SenateReferred to Committee on Rehabilitation and Social Services
2021-01-11SenatePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/13/21 21102664D

Same As/Similar To

SB1388 (Similar To) 2021-01-15 - Incorporated by Rehabilitation and Social Services

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
41119(n/a)See Bill Text
41204(n/a)See Bill Text
41206.1(n/a)See Bill Text
41206.3(n/a)See Bill Text
41207(n/a)See Bill Text
41210(n/a)See Bill Text
41212.1(n/a)See Bill Text
41221(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback