VA SB1299 | 2017 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Vetoed on March 24 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-05 - Requires 27 affirmative votes to override veto
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Carrying concealed handguns; protective orders. Authorizes any person 21 years of age or older who is not prohibited from purchasing, possessing, or transporting a firearm and is protected by an unexpired protective order to carry a concealed handgun for 45 days after the protective order was issued. The bill provides that if the person issued the protective order applies for a concealed handgun permit during such 45-day period, such person will be authorized to carry a concealed handgun for an additional 45 days and be given a copy of the certified application, which shall serve as a de facto concealed handgun permit. The bill requires such person to have the order or certified application and photo identification on his person when carrying a concealed handgun and to display them upon demand by a law-enforcement officer; failure to do so is punishable by a $25 civil penalty. This bill is identical to HB 1852.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Concealed handguns; protective orders.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-04-05 - Senate - Senate: Senate sustained Governor's veto (23-Y 17-N) (Y: 23 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-16 - Senate - Senate: House substitute agreed to by Senate (26-Y 14-N) (Y: 26 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-16 - Senate - Senate: Reconsideration of House substitute agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-16 - Senate - Senate: House substitute agreed to by Senate (26-Y 14-N) (Y: 26 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-14 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (66-Y 32-N) (Y: 66 N: 32 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-10 - House - House: Reported from Militia, Police and Public Safety with substitute (14-Y 7-N) (Y: 14 N: 7 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-24 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (27-Y 13-N) (Y: 27 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-20 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-18 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Courts of Justice (12-Y 3-N) (Y: 12 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-04-05SenateRequires 27 affirmative votes to override veto
2017-04-05SenateSenate sustained Governor's veto (23-Y 17-N)
2017-03-24 Governor: Vetoed by Governor
2017-02-21 Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, March 27, 2017
2017-02-21HouseEnrolled Bill communicated to Governor on 2/21/17
2017-02-21SenateSigned by President
2017-02-20HouseSigned by Speaker
2017-02-20SenateBill text as passed Senate and House (SB1299ER)
2017-02-20SenateEnrolled
2017-02-16SenateTitle replaced 17105388D-H1
2017-02-16SenateHouse substitute agreed to by Senate (26-Y 14-N)
2017-02-16SenateReconsideration of House substitute agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N)
2017-02-16SenateHouse substitute agreed to by Senate (26-Y 14-N)
2017-02-14HouseVOTE: PASSAGE (66-Y 32-N)
2017-02-14HousePassed House with substitute (66-Y 32-N)
2017-02-14HouseEngrossed by House - committee substitute SB1299H1
2017-02-14HouseCommittee substitute agreed to 17105388D-H1
2017-02-14HouseRead third time
2017-02-13HouseRead second time
2017-02-10HouseCommittee substitute printed 17105388D-H1
2017-02-10HouseReported from Militia, Police and Public Safety with substitute (14-Y 7-N)
2017-01-31HouseReferred to Committee on Militia, Police and Public Safety
2017-01-31HouseRead first time
2017-01-31HousePlaced on Calendar
2017-01-24SenateRead third time and passed Senate (27-Y 13-N)
2017-01-23SenateRead second time and engrossed
2017-01-20SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N)
2017-01-18SenateReported from Courts of Justice (12-Y 3-N)
2017-01-10SenateReferred to Committee for Courts of Justice
2017-01-10SenatePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/11/17 17103051D

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
182308.01:1(n/a)See Bill Text
182308.07(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?171+sum+SB1299
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?171+ful+SB1299+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?171+ful+SB1299H1+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?171+ful+SB1299ER+hil
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?171+vot+S03V0071+SB1299
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?171+vot+SV0075SB1299+SB1299
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?171+vot+SV0104SB1299+SB1299
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?171+vot+H15V0068+SB1299
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?171+vot+HV2294+SB1299
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?171+vot+SV0586SB1299+SB1299
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?171+vot+SV0595SB1299+SB1299
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?171+vot+SV0596SB1299+SB1299
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?171+vot+SV1132SB1299+SB1299

Bill Comments

feedback