VA SB1290 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 26 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-03-26 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0637)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 26 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-03-26 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0637)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Venue in criminal cases. Provides that if it cannot readily be determined where a crime was committed in the Commonwealth, venue for the prosecution of the crime may be had in any county or city (i) in which the defendant resides, (ii) in which the defendant is apprehended if he is a nonresident or (iii) in which any related offense was committed if he is a nonresident and is not apprehended in the Commonwealth. The bill also provides that venue for offenses related to a homicide offense may be had in the same county or city as venue for the homicide offense. The bill further provides that venue for homicide offenses may be had in any county or city where any part of the victim's body is found.
Title
Criminal cases; venue for prosecution.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-02-26 - House - House: VOTE: ADOPTION (100-Y 0-N) (Y: 102 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-25 - Senate - Senate: Conference report agreed to by Senate (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-20 - Senate - Senate: Senate acceded to request (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-17 - Senate - Senate: House substitute rejected by Senate (0-Y 38-N) (Y: 0 N: 38 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2015-02-13 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (97-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-11 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (20-Y 0-N) (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-09 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-09 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-06 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-04 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (13-Y 0-N) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-25 - Senate - Senate: Conference report agreed to by Senate (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-20 - Senate - Senate: Senate acceded to request (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-17 - Senate - Senate: House substitute rejected by Senate (0-Y 38-N) (Y: 0 N: 38 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2015-02-13 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (97-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-11 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (20-Y 0-N) (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-09 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-09 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-06 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-04 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (13-Y 0-N) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-26 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0637) | |
2015-03-26 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 637 (effective 7/1/15) | |
2015-03-10 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, Sunday, March 29, 2015 | |
2015-03-10 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on 3/10/15 |
2015-03-07 | Senate | Signed by President |
2015-03-06 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2015-03-06 | Senate | Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB1290ER) |
2015-03-06 | Senate | Enrolled |
2015-02-26 | House | VOTE: ADOPTION (100-Y 0-N) |
2015-02-26 | House | Conference report agreed to by House (100-Y 0-N) |
2015-02-25 | House | Passed by for the day |
2015-02-25 | Senate | Conference report agreed to by Senate (38-Y 0-N) |
2015-02-25 | Senate | Conference substitute printed 15105467D-S2 |
2015-02-25 | Conference: Amended by conference committee | |
2015-02-23 | House | Delegates: Bell, Robert B., Morris, Herring |
2015-02-23 | House | Conferees appointed by House |
2015-02-20 | Senate | Senators: Stuart, McDougle, McEachin |
2015-02-20 | Senate | Conferees appointed by Senate |
2015-02-20 | Senate | Senate acceded to request (38-Y 0-N) |
2015-02-18 | House | House requested conference committee |
2015-02-18 | House | House insisted on substitute |
2015-02-17 | Senate | House substitute rejected by Senate (0-Y 38-N) |
2015-02-13 | House | VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (97-Y 0-N) |
2015-02-13 | House | Passed House with substitute BLOCK VOTE (97-Y 0-N) |
2015-02-13 | House | Engrossed by House - committee substitute SB1290H1 |
2015-02-13 | House | Committee substitute agreed to 15105023D-H1 |
2015-02-13 | House | Read third time |
2015-02-12 | House | Read second time |
2015-02-11 | House | Committee substitute printed 15105023D-H1 |
2015-02-11 | House | Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (20-Y 0-N) |
2015-02-11 | House | Assigned Courts sub: Criminal Law |
2015-02-11 | House | Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice |
2015-02-11 | House | Read first time |
2015-02-11 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2015-02-09 | Senate | Passed Senate (38-Y 0-N) |
2015-02-09 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) |
2015-02-09 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute SB1290S1 |
2015-02-09 | Senate | Committee substitute agreed to 15104791D-S1 |
2015-02-09 | Senate | Reading of substitute waived |
2015-02-09 | Senate | Read second time |
2015-02-06 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) |
2015-02-04 | Senate | Committee substitute printed 15104791D-S1 |
2015-02-04 | Senate | Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (13-Y 0-N) |
2015-01-14 | Senate | Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice |
2015-01-14 | Senate | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/14/15 15102303D |