VA SB1290 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 25 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-03-25 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0558)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 25 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-03-25 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0558)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Pearl Harbor Memorial Highway. Designates I-664 and I-264 in the Hampton Roads Highway Construction District the "Pearl Harbor Memorial Highway."
Title
Pearl Harbor Memorial Highway; designating as I-664 and I-264 in Hampton Roads Highway District.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-02-22 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (93-Y 4-N) (Y: 95 N: 4 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-17 - House - House: Reported from Transportation (21-Y 1-N) (Y: 21 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-15 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (6-Y 0-N) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-01-26 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-01-24 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-01-20 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Transportation with amendment (12-Y 0-N) (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-17 - House - House: Reported from Transportation (21-Y 1-N) (Y: 21 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-15 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (6-Y 0-N) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-01-26 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-01-24 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-01-20 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Transportation with amendment (12-Y 0-N) (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-03-25 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0558) | |
2011-03-25 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 558 (effective 7/1/11) | |
2011-03-06 | Senate: Signed by President | |
2011-03-03 | House: Signed by Speaker | |
2011-03-03 | Senate: Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB1290ER) | |
2011-03-03 | Senate: Enrolled | |
2011-02-22 | House: VOTE: PASSAGE (93-Y 4-N) | |
2011-02-22 | House: Passed House (93-Y 4-N) | |
2011-02-22 | House: Read third time | |
2011-02-21 | House: Passed by for the day | |
2011-02-18 | House: Read second time | |
2011-02-17 | House: Reported from Transportation (21-Y 1-N) | |
2011-02-15 | House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (6-Y 0-N) | |
2011-02-08 | House: Assigned Transportation sub: #3 | |
2011-02-07 | House: Referred to Committee on Transportation | |
2011-02-07 | House: Read first time | |
2011-02-07 | House: Placed on Calendar | |
2011-01-26 | Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) | |
2011-01-25 | Senate: Printed as engrossed 11102997D-E | |
2011-01-25 | Senate: Engrossed by Senate as amended SB1290E | |
2011-01-25 | Senate: Committee amendment agreed to | |
2011-01-25 | Senate: Reading of amendment waived | |
2011-01-25 | Senate: Read second time | |
2011-01-24 | Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) | |
2011-01-20 | Senate: Reported from Transportation with amendment (12-Y 0-N) | |
2011-01-12 | Senate: Referred to Committee on Transportation | |
2011-01-12 | Senate: Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/12/11 11102997D |