VA SB1285 | 2017 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Vetoed on May 3 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-03 - Governor: Vetoed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Conference Sub) [HTML]

Summary

Restitution; probation. Provides that for any offense that occurs on or after July 1, 2017, if restitution is ordered at the time of sentencing, the court shall place the defendant on an indefinite term of probation until all ordered restitution is paid in full. The bill requires that a probation agency ordered to monitor the restitution payments of a defendant placed on supervised probation notify the court and the attorney for the Commonwealth of the amount of unsatisfied restitution, if any, 30 days prior to the defendant's release from supervision. The bill also requires that a court schedule a hearing if any restitution remains unsatisfied on the date upon which restitution was to be paid in full within 90 days of such date if no probation agency was ordered to monitor the defendant's payments. The bill also establishes a mechanism for releasing a defendant from an indefinite term of probation even though all ordered restitution has not been paid in full. As introduced, this bill was a recommendation of the Virginia State Crime Commission. This bill is identical to HB 1856.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Restitution; supervised probation.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-04-05 - Senate - Senate: Senate rejected Governor's recommendation (19-Y 21-N) (Y: 19 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2017-02-23 - Senate - Senate: House substitute agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-22 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (78-Y 21-N) (Y: 78 N: 21 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-20 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (16-Y 5-N) (Y: 16 N: 5 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-13 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment (6-Y 4-N) (Y: 6 N: 4 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-03 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-03 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-02 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-01 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance with amendments (16-Y 0-N) (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-25 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Courts of Justice (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-05-03 Governor: Vetoed by Governor
2017-04-05 Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, May 5, 2017
2017-04-05SenateCommunicated to Governor
2017-04-05SenateSenate rejected Governor's recommendation (19-Y 21-N)
2017-03-24SenateGovernor's substitute printed 17106016D-S1
2017-03-24SenateGovernor's recommendation received by Senate
2017-03-13 Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, March 27, 2017
2017-03-13SenateEnrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on 3/13/17
2017-03-10SenateSigned by President
2017-03-07HouseSigned by Speaker
2017-03-07SenateBill text as passed Senate and House (SB1285ER)
2017-03-07SenateEnrolled
2017-02-23SenateTitle replaced 17105279D-H1
2017-02-23SenateHouse substitute agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N)
2017-02-22HouseVOTE: PASSAGE (78-Y 21-N)
2017-02-22HousePassed House with substitute (78-Y 21-N)
2017-02-22HouseEngrossed by House - committee substitute SB1285H1
2017-02-22HouseCommittee substitute agreed to 17105279D-H1
2017-02-22HouseRead third time
2017-02-22HousePassed by temporarily
2017-02-21HouseRead second time
2017-02-20HouseCommittee substitute printed 17105279D-H1
2017-02-20HouseReported from Courts of Justice with substitute (16-Y 5-N)
2017-02-13HouseSubcommittee recommends reporting with amendment (6-Y 4-N)
2017-02-08HouseAssigned Courts sub: Criminal Law
2017-02-08HouseReferred to Committee for Courts of Justice
2017-02-08HouseRead first time
2017-02-08HousePlaced on Calendar
2017-02-03SenatePassed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
2017-02-03SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
2017-02-03SenatePrinted as engrossed 17103232D-E
2017-02-03SenateEngrossed by Senate as amended SB1285E
2017-02-03SenateCommittee amendments agreed to
2017-02-03SenateReading of amendments waived
2017-02-03SenateRead second time
2017-02-02SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
2017-02-01SenateReported from Finance with amendments (16-Y 0-N)
2017-01-25SenateRereferred to Finance
2017-01-25SenateReported from Courts of Justice (14-Y 0-N)
2017-01-10SenateReferred to Committee for Courts of Justice
2017-01-10SenatePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/11/17 17103232D

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
192303(n/a)See Bill Text
192304(n/a)See Bill Text
192305(n/a)See Bill Text
192305.1(n/a)See Bill Text
192306(n/a)See Bill Text
192368.15(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?171+sum+SB1285
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?171+ful+SB1285+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?171+ful+SB1285E+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?171+ful+SB1285H1+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?171+ful+SB1285ER+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?171+ful+SB1285S1+hil
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?171+vot+S03V0135+SB1285
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?171+vot+S05V0172+SB1285
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?171+vot+SV0254SB1285+SB1285
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?171+vot+SV0291SB1285+SB1285
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?171+vot+SV0292SB1285+SB1285
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?171+vot+H0801V0127+SB1285
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?171+vot+H08V0301+SB1285
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?171+vot+HV2697+SB1285
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?171+vot+SV0919SB1285+SB1285
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?171+vot+SV1107SB1285+SB1285

Bill Comments

feedback