VA SB128 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 30 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-03-30 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0466)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 30 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-03-30 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0466)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Development Fund. Creates the Governor's Agriculture and Forestry Industries Development Fund. The bill establishes an economic development grant and loan program targeted specifically at agricultural and forestry operations. Grants and loans will be awarded to support localities' efforts to attract value-added or processing facilities using Virginia-grown products. Under the program, localities will apply for grants or loans after having established a relationship with a new or expanding business.
Title
Governor's Agriculture and Forestry Industries Development Fund; established, report.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-03-06 - Senate - Senate: House substitute agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-02 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 101 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-27 - House - House: Reported from Appropriations with substitute (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-27 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-01 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-01-30 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 1-N) (Y: 39 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-01-26 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-02 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 101 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-27 - House - House: Reported from Appropriations with substitute (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-27 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-01 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-01-30 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 1-N) (Y: 39 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-01-26 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-03-30 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0466) | |
2012-03-30 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 466 (effective 7/1/12) | |
2012-03-09 | Senate: Signed by President | |
2012-03-08 | House: Signed by Speaker | |
2012-03-08 | Senate: Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB128ER) | |
2012-03-08 | Senate: Enrolled | |
2012-03-06 | Senate: Title replaced 12105649D-H1 | |
2012-03-06 | Senate: House substitute agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) | |
2012-03-02 | House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) | |
2012-03-02 | House: Passed House with substitute BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N) | |
2012-03-02 | House: Engrossed by House - committee substitute SB128H1 | |
2012-03-02 | House: Committee substitute agreed to 12105649D-H1 | |
2012-03-02 | House: Read third time | |
2012-03-01 | House: Passed by for the day | |
2012-02-29 | House: Read second time | |
2012-02-27 | House: Committee substitute printed 12105649D-H1 | |
2012-02-27 | House: Reported from Appropriations with substitute (22-Y 0-N) | |
2012-02-27 | House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (8-Y 0-N) | |
2012-02-17 | House: Assigned App. sub: Economic Development, Agriculture and Natural Resources | |
2012-02-13 | House: Referred to Committee on Appropriations | |
2012-02-13 | House: Read first time | |
2012-02-13 | House: Placed on Calendar | |
2012-02-01 | Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) | |
2012-01-31 | Senate: Read second time and engrossed | |
2012-01-30 | Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 1-N) | |
2012-01-26 | Senate: Reported from Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources (14-Y 0-N) | |
2012-01-10 | Senate: Referred to Committee on Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources | |
2012-01-10 | Senate: Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/11/12 12103772D |
Same As/Similar To
HB766 (Same As) 2012-04-05 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0622)