VA SB1271 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Enrolled on March 13 2023 - 75% progression
Action: 2023-03-13 - Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., March 27, 2023
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Status: Enrolled on March 13 2023 - 75% progression
Action: 2023-03-13 - Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., March 27, 2023
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Animal testing facilities; public notification. Requires any animal testing facility, contract testing facility, or manufacturer, as defined in the bill, that uses an animal test method to display a link to its annual report (APHIS Form 7023) on the homepage or landing page of the facility's or manufacturer's website on or before December 1 for the preceding federal fiscal year. The bill requires an animal testing facility to make certain inspection reports publicly available by displaying a link to access such reports on the home page or landing page of the animal testing facility's website or, if such animal testing facility does not have a website, making such information available by means of a press release or other similar publication. The bill requires any animal testing facility operated by an institution of higher education that receives a citation for critical noncompliance, as defined in the bill, under the Animal Welfare Act or regulations adopted thereunder to notify the leadership of such institution, including the president, dean, and board of visitors or board of trustees. The provisions of the bill do not apply to any federal facility or privately owned licensed veterinary practice.
Title
Animal testing facilities; public notifications, definitions.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-02-25 - House - House: VOTE: Adoption (90-Y 3-N) (Y: 90 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2023-02-25 - Senate - Senate: Conference report agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-23 - Senate - Senate: Senate acceded to request (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-21 - Senate - Senate: House substitute rejected by Senate (0-Y 39-N) (Y: 0 N: 39 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2023-02-20 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (96-Y 2-N) (Y: 96 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-02-15 - House - House: Reported from Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources with substitute (19-Y 1-N) (Y: 19 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-02-08 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (8-Y 1-N) (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-02-06 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-02-06 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-02-03 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-02-02 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance and Appropriations (16-Y 0-N) (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-01-31 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources with substitite (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-25 - Senate - Senate: Conference report agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-23 - Senate - Senate: Senate acceded to request (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-21 - Senate - Senate: House substitute rejected by Senate (0-Y 39-N) (Y: 0 N: 39 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2023-02-20 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (96-Y 2-N) (Y: 96 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-02-15 - House - House: Reported from Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources with substitute (19-Y 1-N) (Y: 19 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-02-08 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (8-Y 1-N) (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-02-06 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-02-06 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-02-03 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-02-02 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance and Appropriations (16-Y 0-N) (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-01-31 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources with substitite (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-03-13 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., March 27, 2023 | |
2023-03-13 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on March 13, 2023 |
2023-03-08 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2023-03-08 | Senate | Signed by President |
2023-03-07 | Senate | Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB1271ER) |
2023-02-25 | House | VOTE: Adoption (90-Y 3-N) |
2023-02-25 | House | Conference report agreed to by House (90-Y 3-N) |
2023-02-25 | Senate | Conference report agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2023-02-25 | Senate | Conference substitute printed 23107552D-S2 |
2023-02-25 | Conference: Amended by conference committee | |
2023-02-23 | House | Delegates: Webert, Wilt, Shin |
2023-02-23 | House | Conferees appointed by House |
2023-02-23 | Senate | Senators: Boysko, McClellan, Stanley |
2023-02-23 | Senate | Conferees appointed by Senate |
2023-02-23 | Senate | Senate acceded to request (40-Y 0-N) |
2023-02-22 | House | House requested conference committee |
2023-02-22 | House | House insisted on substitute |
2023-02-21 | Senate | House substitute rejected by Senate (0-Y 39-N) |
2023-02-20 | House | VOTE: Passage (96-Y 2-N) |
2023-02-20 | House | Passed House with substitute (96-Y 2-N) |
2023-02-20 | House | Engrossed by House - committee substitute SB1271H1 |
2023-02-20 | House | Committee substitute agreed to 23106531D-H1 |
2023-02-20 | House | Read third time |
2023-02-17 | House | Read second time |
2023-02-15 | House | Committee substitute printed 23106531D-H1 |
2023-02-15 | House | Reported from Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources with substitute (19-Y 1-N) |
2023-02-08 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (8-Y 1-N) |
2023-02-08 | House | Assigned ACNR sub: Agriculture |
2023-02-07 | House | Referred to Committee on Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources |
2023-02-07 | House | Read first time |
2023-02-07 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2023-02-06 | Senate | Passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) |
2023-02-06 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) |
2023-02-06 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute SB1271S1 |
2023-02-06 | Senate | Committee substitute agreed to 23106068D-S1 |
2023-02-06 | Senate | Reading of substitute waived |
2023-02-06 | Senate | Read second time |
2023-02-03 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) |
2023-02-02 | Senate | Reported from Finance and Appropriations (16-Y 0-N) |
2023-01-31 | Senate | Rereferred to Finance and Appropriations |
2023-01-31 | Senate | Committee substitute printed 23106068D-S1 |
2023-01-31 | Senate | Reported from Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources with substitite (14-Y 0-N) |
2023-01-25 | Senate | Assigned ACNR sub: Companion Animals |
2023-01-10 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources |
2023-01-10 | Senate | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/11/23 23101434D |
Same As/Similar To
HB2348 (Same As) 2023-03-13 - Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., March 27, 2023
HB2348 (Same As) 2023-03-13 - Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., March 27, 2023
HB2348 (Same As) 2023-03-13 - Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., March 27, 2023
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
3 | 2 | 6593.2 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
3 | 2 | 6593.7 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |