VA SB1251 | 2021 | 1st Special Session
Note: Carry Over of previous SB1251
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 11 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-11 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0054)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 11 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-11 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0054)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Virginia Retirement System; technical amendments. Makes technical amendments to provisions of the Code of Virginia relating to the Virginia Retirement System to reflect recent changes to federal law and conform terminology to federal law.
Title
Virginia Retirement System; technical amendments.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-02-12 - House - House: VOTE: Block Vote Passage (100-Y 0-N) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-10 - House - House: Reported from Appropriations (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-29 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (37-Y 0-N) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-01-27 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-26 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance and Appropriations (16-Y 0-N) (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-10 - House - House: Reported from Appropriations (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-29 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (37-Y 0-N) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-01-27 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-26 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance and Appropriations (16-Y 0-N) (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-11 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0054) | |
2021-03-11 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 54 (effective 7/1/21) | |
2021-02-22 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., March 31, 2021 | |
2021-02-22 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on February 22, 2021 |
2021-02-18 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2021-02-17 | Senate | Signed by President |
2021-02-17 | Senate | Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB1251ER) |
2021-02-17 | Senate | Enrolled |
2021-02-12 | House | VOTE: Block Vote Passage (100-Y 0-N) |
2021-02-12 | House | Passed House BLOCK VOTE (100-Y 0-N) |
2021-02-12 | House | Read third time |
2021-02-11 | House | Read second time |
2021-02-10 | House | Reported from Appropriations (22-Y 0-N) |
2021-02-07 | House | Continued to Special Session 1 in Appropriations by voice vote |
2021-02-02 | House | Referred to Committee on Appropriations |
2021-02-02 | House | Read first time |
2021-02-02 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2021-01-29 | Senate | Read third time and passed Senate (37-Y 0-N) |
2021-01-28 | Senate | Read second time and engrossed |
2021-01-27 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) |
2021-01-26 | Senate | Reported from Finance and Appropriations (16-Y 0-N) |
2021-01-12 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Finance and Appropriations |
2021-01-12 | Senate | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/13/21 21100856D |
Same As/Similar To
SB1251 (Carry Over) 2021-02-07 - Continued to Special Session 1 in Appropriations by voice vote
HB2181 (Same As) 2021-03-11 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0053)
HB2181 (Same As) 2021-03-11 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0053)
HB2181 (Same As) 2021-03-11 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0053)
HB2181 (Same As) 2021-03-11 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0053)
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
51 | 1 | 124.3 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
51 | 1 | 157 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
51 | 1 | 168 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
51 | 1 | 301 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
51 | 1 | 308 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |