VA SB1234 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 12 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-02-17 - House: Tabled in Transportation (12-Y 10-N)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 12 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-02-17 - House: Tabled in Transportation (12-Y 10-N)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
One-way roadways and highways; bicycle operation. Allows the governing body of City of Charlottesville to permit the operation of bicycles in either direction of traffic on one-way roadways and highways.
Title
Bicycle operation; City of Charlottesville to permit in both directions of traffic on one-way roads.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-02-17 - House - House: Tabled in Transportation (12-Y 10-N) (Y: 12 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-16 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (4-Y 2-N) (Y: 4 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-02 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-01-31 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-01-27 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Transportation (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-16 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (4-Y 2-N) (Y: 4 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-02 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-01-31 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-01-27 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Transportation (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-02-17 | House: Tabled in Transportation (12-Y 10-N) | |
2011-02-16 | House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (4-Y 2-N) | |
2011-02-08 | House: Assigned Transportation sub: #2 | |
2011-02-07 | House: Referred to Committee on Transportation | |
2011-02-07 | House: Read first time | |
2011-02-07 | House: Placed on Calendar | |
2011-02-02 | Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) | |
2011-02-01 | Senate: Read second time and engrossed | |
2011-01-31 | Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) | |
2011-01-27 | Senate: Reported from Transportation (14-Y 0-N) | |
2011-01-12 | Senate: Referred to Committee on Transportation | |
2011-01-12 | Senate: Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/12/11 11101505D |