VA SB1225 | 2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future SB1225
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-1)
Status: Engrossed on February 1 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-02-08 - Continued to Special Session 1 in Education by voice vote
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 1 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-02-08 - Continued to Special Session 1 in Education by voice vote
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Broadband services; education. Authorizes school boards to appropriate funds for the purposes of promoting, facilitating, and encouraging the expansion and operation of broadband services for educational purposes. The bill authorizes school boards to partner with private broadband service providers to promote, implement, and subsidize broadband for educational purposes to the households of students who would qualify for (i) a child nutrition program or (ii) any other program recognized or adopted by the local school board as a measuring standard to identify at-risk students.
Title
Broadband services; school boards to appropriate funds for expansion of services for education.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-02-02 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (38-Y 0-N 1-A) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-29 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (35-Y 0-N) (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2021-01-28 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health (12-Y 0-N) (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-18 - Senate - Senate: Rereferred from Commerce and Labor (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-29 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (35-Y 0-N) (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2021-01-28 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health (12-Y 0-N) (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-18 - Senate - Senate: Rereferred from Commerce and Labor (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-02-08 | House | Continued to Special Session 1 in Education by voice vote |
2021-02-05 | House | Referred to Committee on Education |
2021-02-05 | House | Read first time |
2021-02-05 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2021-02-02 | Senate | Read third time and passed Senate (38-Y 0-N 1-A) |
2021-02-01 | Senate | Read second time and engrossed |
2021-01-29 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (35-Y 0-N) |
2021-01-28 | Senate | Reported from Education and Health (12-Y 0-N) |
2021-01-20 | Senate | Assigned Education sub: Public Education |
2021-01-18 | Senate | Rereferred to Education and Health |
2021-01-18 | Senate | Rereferred from Commerce and Labor (15-Y 0-N) |
2021-01-11 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor |
2021-01-11 | Senate | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/13/21 21101489D |
Same As/Similar To
SB1225 (Carry Over) 2021-02-08 - Continued to Special Session 1 in Education by voice vote