VA SB1223 | 2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future SB1223
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Engrossed on January 28 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-02-08 - Continued to Special Session 1 in Labor and Commerce by voice vote
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on January 28 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-02-08 - Continued to Special Session 1 in Labor and Commerce by voice vote
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Transportation electrification; Virginia Energy Plan. Amends the Virginia Energy Plan to include an analysis of electric vehicle charging infrastructure and other infrastructure needed to support the 2045 net-zero carbon target in the transportation sector.
Title
Virginia Energy Plan; amends Plan to include an analysis of electric vehicle charging infrastructure
Sponsors
Sen. Jennifer Boysko [D] | Sen. Jennifer McClellan [D] | Sen. Ghazala Hashmi [D] | Sen. Janet Howell [D] |
Sen. Monty Mason [D] | Sen. Scott Surovell [D] |
Roll Calls
2021-01-29 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (22-Y 15-N) (Y: 22 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-01-27 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-25 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Commerce and Labor (12-Y 3-N) (Y: 12 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-27 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-25 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Commerce and Labor (12-Y 3-N) (Y: 12 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-02-08 | House | Continued to Special Session 1 in Labor and Commerce by voice vote |
2021-02-02 | House | Referred to Committee on Labor and Commerce |
2021-02-02 | House | Read first time |
2021-02-02 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2021-01-29 | Senate | Read third time and passed Senate (22-Y 15-N) |
2021-01-28 | Senate | Read second time and engrossed |
2021-01-27 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) |
2021-01-25 | Senate | Reported from Commerce and Labor (12-Y 3-N) |
2021-01-11 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor |
2021-01-11 | Senate | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/13/21 21101437D |
Same As/Similar To
SB1223 (Carry Over) 2021-02-08 - Continued to Special Session 1 in Labor and Commerce by voice vote