VA SB1223 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 20 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-03-20 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0650)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 20 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-03-20 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0650)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Public schools; evaluation policies and grievance procedures. Makes several changes to the processes by which teachers and certain administrators are evaluated. The bill requires teachers, assistant principals, and principals to be evaluated every year, either formally or informally, and such evaluations to include student academic progress as a significant component and an overall summative rating. The bill allows local school boards to increase from three years to five years the term of probationary service required before a teacher becomes eligible for a continuing contract. The bill also changes the grievance procedure for teachers by giving local school boards the option to assign a grievance hearing to be heard by an impartial hearing officer designated by the local school board and by removing the option for a grievance to be heard in front of a fact-finding panel.
Title
Public schools; evaluation policies and grievance procedures.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-02-13 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (75-Y 25-N) (Y: 77 N: 25 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-11 - House - House: Reported from Education (17-Y 5-N) (Y: 18 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-04 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-04 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-31 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health with substitute (12-Y 2-N) (Y: 12 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-25 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-24 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health with substitute (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-11 - House - House: Reported from Education (17-Y 5-N) (Y: 18 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-04 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-04 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-31 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health with substitute (12-Y 2-N) (Y: 12 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-25 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-24 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health with substitute (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-03-20 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0650) | |
2013-03-20 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 650 (effective 7/1/13) | |
2013-02-20 | Senate | Signed by President |
2013-02-19 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2013-02-19 | Senate | Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB1223ER) |
2013-02-19 | Senate | Enrolled |
2013-02-13 | House | VOTE: PASSAGE (75-Y 25-N) |
2013-02-13 | House | Passed House (75-Y 25-N) |
2013-02-13 | House | Amendments by Delegate Ward rejected |
2013-02-13 | House | Read third time |
2013-02-12 | House | Read second time |
2013-02-11 | House | Reported from Education (17-Y 5-N) |
2013-02-06 | House | Referred to Committee on Education |
2013-02-06 | House | Read first time |
2013-02-06 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2013-02-04 | Senate | Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2013-02-04 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2013-02-04 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute SB1223S2 |
2013-02-04 | Senate | Committee substitute #2 agreed to 13104851D-S2 |
2013-02-04 | Senate | Reading of substitute waived |
2013-02-04 | Senate | Committee substitute #1 rejected 13104502D-S1 |
2013-02-04 | Senate | Reading of substitute waived |
2013-02-04 | Senate | Read second time |
2013-02-01 | Senate | Passed by for the day |
2013-02-01 | Senate | Read second time |
2013-02-01 | Senate | Incorporates SB935 |
2013-01-31 | Senate | Committee substitute printed 13104851D-S2 |
2013-01-31 | Senate | Reported from Education and Health with substitute (12-Y 2-N) |
2013-01-28 | Senate | Recommitted to Education and Health |
2013-01-28 | Senate | Motion to recommit to committee agreed to |
2013-01-25 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2013-01-24 | Senate | Committee substitute printed 13104502D-S1 |
2013-01-24 | Senate | Reported from Education and Health with substitute (14-Y 0-N) |
2013-01-09 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Education and Health |
2013-01-09 | Senate | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/13 13103695D |
Same As/Similar To
HB2151 (Same As) 2013-03-20 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0588)
SB935 (Same As) 2013-01-31 - Incorporated by Education and Health
SB935 (Same As) 2013-01-31 - Incorporated by Education and Health
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
2 | 2 | 507 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
22 | 1 | 1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
22 | 1 | 253.13:5 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
22 | 1 | 293 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
22 | 1 | 294 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
22 | 1 | 295 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
22 | 1 | 298.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
22 | 1 | 299 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
22 | 1 | 299.3 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
22 | 1 | 302 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
22 | 1 | 303 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
22 | 1 | 304 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
22 | 1 | 305 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
22 | 1 | 305.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
22 | 1 | 306 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
22 | 1 | 307 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
22 | 1 | 309 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
22 | 1 | 310 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
22 | 1 | 311 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
22 | 1 | 312 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
22 | 1 | 313 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
22 | 1 | 314 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
22 | 1 | 79 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |