VA SB1221 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 29 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-04-29 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0888)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 29 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-04-29 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0888)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Local rezoning actions. Provides for more limited review by VDOT when a property being considered for rezoning has already been subject to a VDOT review in connection with development of a local comprehensive plan.
Title
Local rezoning actions; limited review by VDOT.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-04-06 - Senate - Senate: Senate rejected Governor's recommendation (15-Y 25-N) (Y: 15 N: 25 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2011-04-06 - Senate - Senate: Reconsideration of Governor's recommendation agreed to (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-06 - Senate - Senate: Senate rejected Governor's recommendation (13-Y 27-N) (Y: 13 N: 27 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2011-02-15 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-11 - House - House: Reported from Counties, Cities and Towns (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-10 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (10-Y 0-N) (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-01 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-01-27 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-01-25 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Local Government (13-Y 0-N) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-06 - Senate - Senate: Reconsideration of Governor's recommendation agreed to (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-06 - Senate - Senate: Senate rejected Governor's recommendation (13-Y 27-N) (Y: 13 N: 27 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2011-02-15 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-11 - House - House: Reported from Counties, Cities and Towns (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-10 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (10-Y 0-N) (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-01 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-01-27 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-01-25 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Local Government (13-Y 0-N) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-04-29 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0888) | |
2011-04-29 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 888 (effective 7/1/11) | |
2011-04-06 | Senate: Communicated to Governor | |
2011-04-06 | Senate: Senate rejected Governor's recommendation (15-Y 25-N) | |
2011-04-06 | Senate: Reconsideration of Governor's recommendation agreed to (40-Y 0-N) | |
2011-04-06 | Senate: Senate rejected Governor's recommendation (13-Y 27-N) | |
2011-04-05 | Senate: Placed on Calendar | |
2011-03-26 | Senate: Governor's recommendation received by Senate | |
2011-02-21 | Senate: Signed by President | |
2011-02-18 | House: Signed by Speaker | |
2011-02-18 | Senate: Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB1221ER) | |
2011-02-18 | Senate: Enrolled | |
2011-02-15 | House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N) | |
2011-02-15 | House: Passed House BLOCK VOTE (98-Y 0-N) | |
2011-02-15 | House: Read third time | |
2011-02-14 | House: Read second time | |
2011-02-11 | House: Reported from Counties, Cities and Towns (22-Y 0-N) | |
2011-02-10 | House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (10-Y 0-N) | |
2011-02-08 | House: Assigned CC & T sub: #2 | |
2011-02-07 | House: Referred to Committee on Counties, Cities and Towns | |
2011-02-07 | House: Read first time | |
2011-02-07 | House: Placed on Calendar | |
2011-02-01 | Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) | |
2011-01-31 | Senate: Read second time and engrossed | |
2011-01-28 | Senate: Passed by for the day | |
2011-01-27 | Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) | |
2011-01-25 | Senate: Reported from Local Government (13-Y 0-N) | |
2011-01-12 | Senate: Referred to Committee on Local Government | |
2011-01-12 | Senate: Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/12/11 11101456D |