VA SB1217 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on March 16 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-03-16 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0224)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on March 16 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-03-16 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0224)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Private police departments. Defines "private police department" as any police department that employs private police officers operated by an entity authorized by statute or an act of assembly to establish a private police department. The bill provides that the authority of a private police department is limited to real property owned, leased, or controlled by the entity and, if approved by the local chief of police or sheriff, any contiguous property. The bill also provides that private police departments and private police officers shall be subject to and comply with the relevant laws and regulations governing municipal police departments and shall meet the minimum compulsory training requirements for law-enforcement officers. The bill provides further that any private police department in existence on January 1, 2013, that was not otherwise established by statute or an act of assembly and whose status as a private police department was recognized by the Department of Criminal Justice Services at that time may continue to operate as a private police department. provided that it complies with the necessary requirements. The private police departments so recognized by the Department are the Aquia Harbor Police Department, the Babcock and Wilcox Police Department, the Bridgewater Airpark Police Department, the Carilion Police and Security Services Department, the Kings Dominion Park Police Department, the Kingsmill Police Department, the Lake Monticello Police Department, the Massanutten Police Department, and the Wintergreen Police Department. The bill contains an emergency clause. This bill is a recommendation of the Virginia State Crime Commission.
Title
Private police department; definition.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-02-19 - Senate - Senate: House amendments agreed to by Senate (37-Y 0-N) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-17 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 101 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-13 - House - House: Reported from Militia, Police and Public Safety with amendments (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-12 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-27 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-23 - Senate - Senate: Reconsideration of Passed by for the day agreed to (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-23 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-21 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-17 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 101 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-13 - House - House: Reported from Militia, Police and Public Safety with amendments (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-12 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-27 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-23 - Senate - Senate: Reconsideration of Passed by for the day agreed to (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-23 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-21 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-16 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0224) | |
2015-03-16 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 224 (effective 3/16/15) | |
2015-02-26 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, Sunday, March 29, 2015 | |
2015-02-26 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on 2/26/15 |
2015-02-26 | Senate | Signed by President |
2015-02-24 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2015-02-24 | Senate | Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB1217ER) |
2015-02-24 | Senate | Enrolled |
2015-02-19 | Senate | House amendments agreed to by Senate (37-Y 0-N) |
2015-02-19 | Senate | Passed by temporarily |
2015-02-17 | House | VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) |
2015-02-17 | House | Passed House with amendments BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N) |
2015-02-17 | House | Engrossed by House as amended |
2015-02-17 | House | Committee amendments agreed to |
2015-02-17 | House | Read third time |
2015-02-16 | House | Read second time |
2015-02-13 | House | Reported from Militia, Police and Public Safety with amendments (21-Y 0-N) |
2015-02-12 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (8-Y 0-N) |
2015-02-06 | House | Assigned MPPS sub: #2 |
2015-01-30 | House | Referred to Committee on Militia, Police and Public Safety |
2015-01-30 | House | Read first time |
2015-01-30 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2015-01-27 | Senate | Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2015-01-26 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute SB1217S1 |
2015-01-26 | Senate | Committee substitute agreed to 15104082D-S1 |
2015-01-26 | Senate | Reading of substitute waived |
2015-01-26 | Senate | Read second time |
2015-01-23 | Senate | Passed by for the day |
2015-01-23 | Senate | Reconsideration of Passed by for the day agreed to (39-Y 0-N) |
2015-01-23 | Senate | Passed by for the day |
2015-01-23 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2015-01-22 | Senate | Incorporates SB939 |
2015-01-21 | Senate | Committee substitute printed 15104082D-S1 |
2015-01-21 | Senate | Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (14-Y 0-N) |
2015-01-14 | Senate | Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice |
2015-01-14 | Senate | Prefiled and ordered printed with emergency clause; offered 01/14/15 15102661D |
Same As/Similar To
HB1606 (Same As) 2015-03-16 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0195)
SB939 (Same As) 2015-01-21 - Incorporated by Courts of Justice
SB939 (Same As) 2015-01-21 - Incorporated by Courts of Justice