VA SB1216 | 2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future SB1216
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on January 20 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-02-08 - Continued to Special Session 1 in Counties, Cities and Towns by voice vote
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on January 20 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-02-08 - Continued to Special Session 1 in Counties, Cities and Towns by voice vote
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Charter; Town of Crewe; town council; elections and powers. Makes various changes to the charter for the Town of Crewe in Nottoway County, including (i) staggering town council elections; (ii) changing from three to two the number of town council members required to call a special meeting; and (iii) transferring from the town council to the town manager the authority to appoint, suspend, or terminate the chief of police with majority approval by the town council. The bill also repeals provisions related to the establishment of a municipal court.
Title
Crewe, Town of; amending charter, changes to charter including town council, elections and powers.
Sponsors
Sen. Frank Ruff [R] |
Roll Calls
2021-01-21 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-19 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-01-18 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Local Government (13-Y 0-N) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-19 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-01-18 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Local Government (13-Y 0-N) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-02-08 | House | Continued to Special Session 1 in Counties, Cities and Towns by voice vote |
2021-02-02 | House | Referred to Committee on Counties, Cities and Towns |
2021-02-02 | House | Read first time |
2021-02-02 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2021-01-21 | Senate | Read third time and passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) |
2021-01-20 | Senate | Read second time and engrossed |
2021-01-19 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) |
2021-01-18 | Senate | Reported from Local Government (13-Y 0-N) |
2021-01-15 | Senate | Assigned Local Gov sub: Charters |
2021-01-11 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Local Government |
2021-01-11 | Senate | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/13/21 21101181D |
Same As/Similar To
SB1216 (Carry Over) 2021-02-08 - Continued to Special Session 1 in Counties, Cities and Towns by voice vote