VA SB121 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on December 30 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-02-03 - Failed to report (defeated) in Courts of Justice (5-Y 8-N)
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on December 30 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-02-03 - Failed to report (defeated) in Courts of Justice (5-Y 8-N)
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Prohibited conduct by state and local government officers and employees; retaliation. Prohibits a state or local government officer or employee from using his public position to retaliate or threaten retaliation against any person for expressing views on matters of public concern or for exercising any right that is otherwise protected by law.
Title
State and local government officers and employees; prohibitied conduct.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-02-03 - Senate - Senate: Failed to report (defeated) in Courts of Justice (5-Y 8-N) (Y: 5 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-01-24 - Senate - Senate: Rereferred from Rules (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-20 - Senate - Senate: Rereferred from General Laws and Technology (12-Y 0-N) (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-24 - Senate - Senate: Rereferred from Rules (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-20 - Senate - Senate: Rereferred from General Laws and Technology (12-Y 0-N) (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-02-03 | Senate | Failed to report (defeated) in Courts of Justice (5-Y 8-N) |
2014-01-24 | Senate | Rereferred to Courts of Justice |
2014-01-24 | Senate | Rereferred from Rules (15-Y 0-N) |
2014-01-20 | Senate | Rereferred to Rules |
2014-01-20 | Senate | Rereferred from General Laws and Technology (12-Y 0-N) |
2013-12-30 | Senate | Referred to Committee on General Laws and Technology |
2013-12-30 | Senate | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/14 14101882D |