VA SB1196 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 4 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-02-08 - Continued to Special Session 1 in Education by voice vote
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]

Summary

Teachers and other licensed school board employees; cultural competency. The bill requires teacher, principal, and division superintendent evaluations to include an evaluation of cultural competency. The bill requires every person seeking initial licensure or renewal of a license from the Board of Education (i) to complete instruction or training in cultural competency and (ii) with an endorsement in history and social sciences to complete instruction in African American history, as prescribed by the Board. The bill also requires each school board to adopt and implement policies that require each teacher and any other school board employee holding a license issued by the Board to complete cultural competency training, in accordance with guidance issued by the Board, at least every two years.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Teachers and other licensed school board employees; cultural competency.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-02-05 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (22-Y 16-N) (Y: 22 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-03 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (37-Y 0-N) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-02-02 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance and Appropriations (13-Y 3-N) (Y: 13 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-14 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health (9-Y 4-N 1-A) (Y: 9 N: 4 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-02-08HouseContinued to Special Session 1 in Education by voice vote
2021-02-07HouseReferred to Committee on Education
2021-02-07HouseRead first time
2021-02-07HousePlaced on Calendar
2021-02-05SenateRead third time and passed Senate (22-Y 16-N)
2021-02-04SenateRead second time and engrossed
2021-02-03SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (37-Y 0-N)
2021-02-02SenateReported from Finance and Appropriations (13-Y 3-N)
2021-01-14SenateRereferred to Finance and Appropriations
2021-01-14SenateReported from Education and Health (9-Y 4-N 1-A)
2021-01-11SenateReferred to Committee on Education and Health
2021-01-11SenatePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/13/21 21101992D

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
221253.13:5(n/a)See Bill Text
221298.1(n/a)See Bill Text
221298.7(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback