VA SB1194 | 2021 | 1st Special Session

Note: Carryover of previous SB1194

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 25 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-02-25 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0032)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Produce safety; sunset. Removes the sunset date for Chapter 51.1 (§ 3.2-5146 et seq.) of Title 3.2 on produce safety, which was enacted in 2017 and set to expire upon the effective date of the repeal of certain federal regulations or on July 1, 2022, whichever occurs sooner. The chapter will still expire upon the effective date of the repeal of such federal regulations that require the provisions of Chapter 51.1 to exist.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Produce safety; removes the sunset date.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-02-15 - House - House: VOTE: Block Vote Passage (100-Y 0-N) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-10 - House - House: Reported from Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-01-25 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (37-Y 2-N) (Y: 37 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-21 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-19 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources (14-Y 1-N) (Y: 14 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-02-25 Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0032)
2021-02-25 Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 32 (effective 7/1/21)
2021-02-22 Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., March 31, 2021
2021-02-22SenateEnrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on February 22, 2021
2021-02-18HouseSigned by Speaker
2021-02-17SenateSigned by President
2021-02-17SenateBill text as passed Senate and House (SB1194ER)
2021-02-17SenateEnrolled
2021-02-15HouseVOTE: Block Vote Passage (100-Y 0-N)
2021-02-15HousePassed House BLOCK VOTE (100-Y 0-N)
2021-02-15HouseRead third time
2021-02-12HouseRead second time
2021-02-10HouseReported from Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources (21-Y 0-N)
2021-02-08HouseContinued to Special Session 1 in Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources by voice vote
2021-02-02HouseReferred to Committee on Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources
2021-02-02HouseRead first time
2021-02-02HousePlaced on Calendar
2021-01-25SenateRead third time and passed Senate (37-Y 2-N)
2021-01-22SenateRead second time and engrossed
2021-01-21SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
2021-01-19SenateReported from Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources (14-Y 1-N)
2021-01-11SenateReferred to Committee on Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources
2021-01-11SenatePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/13/21 21102116D

Same As/Similar To

SB1194 (Carry Over) 2021-02-08 - Continued to Special Session 1 in Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources by voice vote

Subjects


Virginia State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+sum+SB1194
Texthttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+ful+SB1194+hil
Texthttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+ful+SB1194ER+hil
Texthttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+ful+CHAP0032+hil
Supplementhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+oth+SB1194F122+PDF
Supplementhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+oth+SB1194FER122+PDF
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+vot+S01C0010+SB1194
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+vot+SC0068SB1194+SB1194
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+vot+SC0095SB1194+SB1194
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+vot+H01V0010+SB1194
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+vot+HV1557+SB1194

Bill Comments 750

feedback