VA SB1186 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 15 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-15 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0752)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 15 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-15 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0752)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Naloxone; administration in cases of opiate overdose. Provides that a pharmacist may dispense naloxone or other opioid antagonist used for overdose reversal pursuant to an oral, written, or standing order issued by a prescriber and in accordance with protocols developed by the Board of Pharmacy in consultation with the Board of Medicine and the Department of Health, that a person may possess and administer naloxone or other opioid antagonist used for overdose reversal to a person who is believed to be experiencing or about to experience a life-threatening opiate overdose, and that firefighters and law-enforcement officers who have completed a training program may possess and administer naloxone in accordance with protocols developed by the Board of Pharmacy in consultation with the Board of Medicine and the Department of Health. The bill also provides that a person who in good faith prescribes, dispenses, or administers naloxone or other opioid antagonist used for overdose reversal in an emergency to an individual who is believed to be experiencing or about to experience a life-threatening opioid overdose shall not be liable for any civil damages for ordinary negligence in acts or omissions resulting from the rendering of such treatment if acting in accordance with the provisions of § 54.1-3408 or in his role as a member of an emergency medical services agency. The bill contains an emergency clause.
Title
Naloxone; administration in cases of opiate overdose.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-04-15 - House - House: VOTE: ADOPTION EMERGENCY (98-Y 0-N) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-15 - Senate - Senate: Senate concurred in Governor's recommendation (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-26 - Senate - Senate: Conference report agreed to by Senate (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-26 - House - House: VOTE: ADOPTION (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 101 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-25 - Senate - Senate: Senate acceded to request (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-23 - Senate - Senate: House substitute rejected by Senate (1-Y 39-N) (Y: 1 N: 39 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2015-02-19 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N) (Y: 102 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-17 - House - House: Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions with substitute (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-09 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-09 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-06 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-05 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health (12-Y 0-N) (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-15 - Senate - Senate: Senate concurred in Governor's recommendation (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-26 - Senate - Senate: Conference report agreed to by Senate (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-26 - House - House: VOTE: ADOPTION (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 101 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-25 - Senate - Senate: Senate acceded to request (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-23 - Senate - Senate: House substitute rejected by Senate (1-Y 39-N) (Y: 1 N: 39 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2015-02-19 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N) (Y: 102 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-17 - House - House: Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions with substitute (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-09 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-09 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-06 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-05 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health (12-Y 0-N) (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-04-15 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0752) | |
2015-04-15 | House | Enacted, Chapter 752 (effective 4/15/15) |
2015-04-15 | House | Signed by Speaker as reenrolled |
2015-04-15 | Senate | Signed by President as reenrolled |
2015-04-15 | Senate | Reenrolled bill text (SB1186ER2) |
2015-04-15 | Senate | Reenrolled |
2015-04-15 | Governor: Emergency clause added by Governor's recommendation | |
2015-04-15 | Governor: Governor's recommendation adopted | |
2015-04-15 | House | VOTE: ADOPTION EMERGENCY (98-Y 0-N) |
2015-04-15 | House | House concurred in Governor's recommendation (98-Y 0-N) |
2015-04-15 | Senate | Senate concurred in Governor's recommendation (39-Y 0-N) |
2015-04-14 | Senate | Placed on Calendar |
2015-03-27 | Senate | Governor's recommendation received by Senate |
2015-03-10 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, Sunday, March 29, 2015 | |
2015-03-10 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on 3/10/15 |
2015-03-07 | Senate | Signed by President |
2015-03-06 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2015-03-06 | Senate | Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB1186ER) |
2015-03-06 | Senate | Enrolled |
2015-02-26 | Senate | Conference report agreed to by Senate (38-Y 0-N) |
2015-02-26 | House | VOTE: ADOPTION (99-Y 0-N) |
2015-02-26 | House | Conference report agreed to by House (99-Y 0-N) |
2015-02-26 | Conference: Amended by conference committee | |
2015-02-26 | House | Delegates: O'Bannon, Hodges, Sickles |
2015-02-26 | House | Conferees appointed by House |
2015-02-25 | Senate | Senators: Obenshain, Barker, Smith |
2015-02-25 | Senate | Conferees appointed by Senate |
2015-02-25 | Senate | Senate acceded to request (39-Y 0-N) |
2015-02-24 | House | House requested conference committee |
2015-02-24 | House | House insisted on substitute |
2015-02-23 | Senate | House substitute rejected by Senate (1-Y 39-N) |
2015-02-19 | House | VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N) |
2015-02-19 | House | Passed House with substitute BLOCK VOTE (100-Y 0-N) |
2015-02-19 | House | Engrossed by House - committee substitute SB1186H1 |
2015-02-19 | House | Committee substitute agreed to 15105204D-H1 |
2015-02-19 | House | Read third time |
2015-02-18 | House | Read second time |
2015-02-17 | House | Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions with substitute (22-Y 0-N) |
2015-02-17 | House | Committee substitute printed 15105204D-H1 |
2015-02-11 | House | Referred to Committee on Health, Welfare and Institutions |
2015-02-11 | House | Read first time |
2015-02-11 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2015-02-09 | Senate | Passed Senate (38-Y 0-N) |
2015-02-09 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) |
2015-02-09 | Senate | Read second time and engrossed |
2015-02-06 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) |
2015-02-05 | Senate | Reported from Education and Health (12-Y 0-N) |
2015-01-20 | Senate | Assigned Education sub: Health Professions |
2015-01-13 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Education and Health |
2015-01-13 | Senate | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/14/15 15103537D |
Same As/Similar To
HB1458 (Same As) 2015-04-15 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0725)
HB1833 (Same As) 2015-04-15 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0732)
HB1833 (Same As) 2015-04-15 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0732)
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
54 | 1 | 3303.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
54 | 1 | 3408 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
54 | 1 | 3408.001 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
8 | 01 | 225 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |