VA SB1180 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 1 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-02-08 - Continued to Special Session 1 in Courts of Justice by voice vote
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Civil actions filed on behalf of multiple persons. Provides that a circuit court may enter an order joining, coordinating, consolidating, or transferring civil actions upon finding that separate civil actions brought by a plaintiff on behalf of multiple similarly situated persons involve common questions of law or fact and arise out of the same transaction, occurrence, or series of transactions or occurrences. The bill requires the Supreme Court to promulgate rules no later than November 1, 2021, governing such actions. The bill has a delayed effective date of July 1, 2022. Civil actions filed on behalf of multiple persons. Provides that a circuit court may enter an order joining, coordinating, consolidating, or transferring civil actions upon finding that separate civil actions brought by a plaintiff on behalf of multiple similarly situated persons involve common questions of law or fact and arise out of the same transaction, occurrence, or series of transactions or occurrences. The bill requires the Supreme Court to promulgate rules no later than November 1, 2021, governing such actions. The bill has a delayed effective date of July 1, 2022.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Civil actions; actions filed on behalf of multiple similarly situated persons.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-02-02 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (21-Y 18-N) (Y: 21 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-29 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (35-Y 0-N) (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2021-01-27 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Judiciary with substitute (9-Y 4-N) (Y: 9 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-02-08HouseContinued to Special Session 1 in Courts of Justice by voice vote
2021-02-05HouseReferred to Committee for Courts of Justice
2021-02-05HouseRead first time
2021-02-05HousePlaced on Calendar
2021-02-02SenateRead third time and passed Senate (21-Y 18-N)
2021-02-01SenatePrinted as engrossed 21103326D-ES1
2021-02-01SenateEngrossed by Senate - committee substitute with amendments SB1180ES1
2021-02-01SenateAmendments by Senator Surovell agreed to
2021-02-01SenateReading of amendments waived
2021-02-01SenateCommittee substitute agreed to 21103326D-S1
2021-02-01SenateReading of substitute waived
2021-02-01SenateRead second time
2021-01-29SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (35-Y 0-N)
2021-01-27SenateCommittee substitute printed 21103326D-S1
2021-01-27SenateReported from Judiciary with substitute (9-Y 4-N)
2021-01-08SenateReferred to Committee on the Judiciary
2021-01-08SenatePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/13/21 21102394D

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
801267.1(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback