VA SB1172 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on January 26 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-02-08 - Continued to Special Session 1 in Rules by voice vote
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]

Summary

Capitol Square Preservation Council; powers and duties; review and approval of plans for changes to artifacts contained within the Capitol Building. Grants the Capitol Square Preservation Council the authority to review and approve all plans or proposals for alterations, improvements, additions, or renovations to, or other disposition of, any monuments, statuary, artwork, or other historical artifacts contained within the Capitol Building, including within the old and new Senate chambers, the old and new halls of the House of Delegates, and the Rotunda.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Capitol Square Preservation Council; powers and duties, review and approval of plans for changes.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-01-27 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-25 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-22 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Rules (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-02-08HouseContinued to Special Session 1 in Rules by voice vote
2021-02-05HouseReferred to Committee on Rules
2021-02-05HouseRead first time
2021-02-05HousePlaced on Calendar
2021-01-27SenateRead third time and passed Senate (39-Y 0-N)
2021-01-26SenateRead second time and engrossed
2021-01-25SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
2021-01-22SenateReported from Rules (14-Y 0-N)
2021-01-08SenateReferred to Committee on Rules
2021-01-08SenatePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/13/21 21100598D

Virginia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback