VA SB1171 | 2021 | 1st Special Session
Note: Carry Over of previous SB1171
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on January 20 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-01 - Left in General Laws
Pending: House General Laws Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on January 20 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-01 - Left in General Laws
Pending: House General Laws Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
State and Local Government Conflict of Interests Act; disclosure requirements; industrial development authorities and economic development authorities. Requires the executive director and members of each industrial development authority and economic development authority, as created by the Industrial Development and Revenue Bond Act, in a locality with a population in excess of 25,000 or in a region serving more than one locality that, in the aggregate, has a population in excess of 25,000 to file a Statement of Economic Interests (SOEI) with the clerk of the local governing body as a condition to assuming office and thereafter annually on or before February 1. Current law requires all executive directors and members of industrial development authorities and economic development authorities, as created by the Industrial Development and Revenue Bond Act, to file a SOEI. State and Local Government Conflict of Interests Act; disclosure requirements; industrial development authorities and economic development authorities. Requires the executive director and members of each industrial development authority and economic development authority, as created by the Industrial Development and Revenue Bond Act, in a locality with a population in excess of 25,000 or in a region serving more than one locality that, in the aggregate, has a population in excess of 25,000 to file a Statement of Economic Interests (SOEI) with the clerk of the local governing body as a condition to assuming office and thereafter annually on or before February 1. Current law requires all executive directors and members of industrial development authorities and economic development authorities, as created by the Industrial Development and Revenue Bond Act, to file a SOEI.
Title
Conflict of Interests Act, State and Local Government; disclosure requirements.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-02-16 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends laying on the table (5-Y 3-N) (Y: 5 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-21 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (24-Y 15-N) (Y: 24 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-15 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (35-Y 0-N) (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2021-01-13 - Senate - Senate: Reported from General Laws and Technology with amendment (14-Y 1-N) (Y: 14 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-21 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (24-Y 15-N) (Y: 24 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-15 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (35-Y 0-N) (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2021-01-13 - Senate - Senate: Reported from General Laws and Technology with amendment (14-Y 1-N) (Y: 14 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-01 | House | Left in General Laws |
2021-02-16 | House | Subcommittee recommends laying on the table (5-Y 3-N) |
2021-02-09 | House | Assigned GL sub: Open Government/Procurement |
2021-02-08 | House | Continued to Special Session 1 in General Laws by voice vote |
2021-02-05 | House | Referred to Committee on General Laws |
2021-02-05 | House | Read first time |
2021-02-05 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2021-01-21 | Senate | Read third time and passed Senate (24-Y 15-N) |
2021-01-20 | Senate | Printed as engrossed 21100535D-E |
2021-01-20 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate as amended SB1171E |
2021-01-20 | Senate | Amendments by Senator Barker agreed to |
2021-01-20 | Senate | Reading of amendments waived |
2021-01-20 | Senate | Committee amendment rejected |
2021-01-20 | Senate | Reading of amendment waived |
2021-01-20 | Senate | Amendments by Senator Norment withdrawn |
2021-01-20 | Senate | Read second time |
2021-01-19 | Senate | Passed by for the day |
2021-01-18 | Senate | Passed by for the day |
2021-01-15 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (35-Y 0-N) |
2021-01-13 | Senate | Reported from General Laws and Technology with amendment (14-Y 1-N) |
2021-01-08 | Senate | Referred to Committee on General Laws and Technology |
2021-01-08 | Senate | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/13/21 21100535D |
Same As/Similar To
SB1171 (Carry Over) 2021-02-08 - Continued to Special Session 1 in General Laws by voice vote
Subjects
Administration of Government
Conflict of Interests
Economic Development
Industrial Development
Local Government and Officials
Conflict of Interests
Economic Development
Industrial Development
Local Government and Officials