VA SB1156 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Vetoed on March 19 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-03 - Requires 2/3 affirmative votes to pass in enrolled form
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on March 19 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-03 - Requires 2/3 affirmative votes to pass in enrolled form
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Sanctuary policies prohibited. Provides that no locality shall adopt any ordinance, procedure, or policy intended to restrict the enforcement of federal immigration laws.
Title
Sanctuary policies; policies prohibited that restrict enforcement of federal immigration laws.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-04-03 - Senate - Senate: Motion to pass in enrolled form rejected (20-Y 18-N) (Y: 20 N: 18 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-02-20 - Senate - Senate: House amendment agreed to by Senate (21-Y 19-N) (Y: 21 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-19 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (51-Y 47-N) (Y: 51 N: 47 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-19 - House - House: VOTE: AGREE TO MOTION REJECTED (48-Y 51-N) (Y: 48 N: 51 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-02-15 - House - House: Reported from Counties, Cities and Towns with amendment (12-Y 9-N) (Y: 12 N: 9 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-13 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment (5-Y 3-N) (Y: 5 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-17 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (21-Y 19-N) (Y: 21 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-15 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-14 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Courts of Justice (8-Y 6-N) (Y: 8 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-20 - Senate - Senate: House amendment agreed to by Senate (21-Y 19-N) (Y: 21 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-19 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (51-Y 47-N) (Y: 51 N: 47 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-19 - House - House: VOTE: AGREE TO MOTION REJECTED (48-Y 51-N) (Y: 48 N: 51 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-02-15 - House - House: Reported from Counties, Cities and Towns with amendment (12-Y 9-N) (Y: 12 N: 9 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-13 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment (5-Y 3-N) (Y: 5 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-17 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (21-Y 19-N) (Y: 21 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-15 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-14 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Courts of Justice (8-Y 6-N) (Y: 8 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-03 | Senate | Requires 2/3 affirmative votes to pass in enrolled form |
2019-04-03 | Senate | Motion to pass in enrolled form rejected (20-Y 18-N) |
2019-03-19 | Governor: Vetoed by Governor | |
2019-03-04 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, March 26, 2019 | |
2019-03-04 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on March 4, 2019 |
2019-02-23 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2019-02-23 | Senate | Signed by President |
2019-02-23 | Senate | Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB1156ER) |
2019-02-23 | Senate | Enrolled |
2019-02-20 | Senate | House amendment agreed to by Senate (21-Y 19-N) |
2019-02-19 | House | VOTE: PASSAGE (51-Y 47-N) |
2019-02-19 | House | Passed House with amendment (51-Y 47-N) |
2019-02-19 | House | Engrossed by House as amended |
2019-02-19 | House | Pending question ordered |
2019-02-19 | House | VOTE: AGREE TO MOTION REJECTED (48-Y 51-N) |
2019-02-19 | House | Motion to refer to committee on Militia, Police and Public Safety rejected (48-Y 51-N) |
2019-02-19 | House | Committee amendment agreed to |
2019-02-19 | House | Read third time |
2019-02-18 | House | Read second time |
2019-02-15 | House | Reported from Counties, Cities and Towns with amendment (12-Y 9-N) |
2019-02-13 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment (5-Y 3-N) |
2019-02-06 | House | Assigned CC & T sub: Subcommittee #1 |
2019-01-21 | House | Referred to Committee on Counties, Cities and Towns |
2019-01-21 | House | Read first time |
2019-01-21 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2019-01-17 | Senate | Read third time and passed Senate (21-Y 19-N) |
2019-01-16 | Senate | Read second time and engrossed |
2019-01-15 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2019-01-14 | Senate | Reported from Courts of Justice (8-Y 6-N) |
2019-01-02 | Senate | Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice |
2019-01-02 | Senate | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/19 19101078D |