VA SB1151 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 23 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-03-23 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0526)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 23 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-03-23 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0526)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
State and local advisory team; membership. Expands membership of the state and local advisory team for the State Executive Council for Comprehensive Services for At-Risk Youth and Families to include (i) one parent representative who is not an employee of any public or private program that serves children and families and who has a child who has received services that are within the purview of the Comprehensive Services Act and (ii) one member from each of the five different geographical areas of the Commonwealth who is representative of one of the different participants of community policy and management teams pursuant to § 2.2-5205.
Title
State and local advisory team; expands membership.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-02-19 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (99-Y 1-N) (Y: 101 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-17 - House - House: Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions (21-Y 1-N) (Y: 22 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-12 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (3-Y 1-N) (Y: 3 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2015-01-28 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-26 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-23 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Rehabilitation and Social Services (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-17 - House - House: Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions (21-Y 1-N) (Y: 22 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-12 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (3-Y 1-N) (Y: 3 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2015-01-28 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-26 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-23 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Rehabilitation and Social Services (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-23 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0526) | |
2015-03-23 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 526 (effective 7/1/15) | |
2015-02-26 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, Sunday, March 29, 2015 | |
2015-02-26 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on 2/26/15 |
2015-02-26 | Senate | Signed by President |
2015-02-24 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2015-02-24 | Senate | Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB1151ER) |
2015-02-24 | Senate | Enrolled |
2015-02-19 | House | VOTE: PASSAGE (99-Y 1-N) |
2015-02-19 | House | Passed House (99-Y 1-N) |
2015-02-19 | House | Read third time |
2015-02-18 | House | Read second time |
2015-02-17 | House | Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions (21-Y 1-N) |
2015-02-12 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting (3-Y 1-N) |
2015-02-10 | House | Assigned HWI sub: Subcommittee #3 |
2015-01-30 | House | Referred to Committee on Health, Welfare and Institutions |
2015-01-30 | House | Read first time |
2015-01-30 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2015-01-28 | Senate | Read third time and passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) |
2015-01-27 | Senate | Read second time and engrossed |
2015-01-26 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) |
2015-01-23 | Senate | Reported from Rehabilitation and Social Services (14-Y 0-N) |
2015-01-13 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Rehabilitation and Social Services |
2015-01-13 | Senate | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/14/15 15101417D |