VA SB1125 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Engrossed on January 29 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-02-08 - Continued to Special Session 1 in Courts of Justice by voice vote
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Parole Board; notice to victim. Requires the Parole Board, within seven days of making any decision regarding the parole of a prisoner, to provide written or electronic notice of such decision to the victim of the crime for which the prisoner was incarcerated, unless the victim has submitted a written request to forgo such notice. Parole Board; notice to victim. Requires the Parole Board, within seven days of making any decision regarding the parole of a prisoner, to provide written or electronic notice of such decision to the victim of the crime for which the prisoner was incarcerated, unless the victim has submitted a written request to forgo such notice.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Parole Board; notice of parole of prisoner to victim.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-02-01 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-01 - Senate - Senate: Reconsideration of passage agreed to by Senate (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-01 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-01-28 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-01-27 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance and Appropriations (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-15 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Rehabilitation and Social Services with amendments (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-02-08HouseContinued to Special Session 1 in Courts of Justice by voice vote
2021-02-05HouseReferred to Committee for Courts of Justice
2021-02-05HouseRead first time
2021-02-05HousePlaced on Calendar
2021-02-01SenatePassed Senate (39-Y 0-N)
2021-02-01SenateReconsideration of passage agreed to by Senate (39-Y 0-N)
2021-02-01SenateRead third time and passed Senate (38-Y 0-N)
2021-01-29SenatePrinted as engrossed 21101811D-E
2021-01-29SenateEngrossed by Senate as amended SB1125E
2021-01-29SenateCommittee amendments agreed to
2021-01-29SenateReading of amendments waived
2021-01-29SenateRead second time
2021-01-28SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N)
2021-01-27SenateReported from Finance and Appropriations (15-Y 0-N)
2021-01-15SenateRereferred to Finance and Appropriations
2021-01-15SenateReported from Rehabilitation and Social Services with amendments (14-Y 0-N)
2020-12-22SenateReferred to Committee on Rehabilitation and Social Services
2020-12-22SenatePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/13/21 21101811D

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
531136(n/a)See Bill Text
531155(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?211+sum+SB1125
Texthttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?211+ful+SB1125+hil
Texthttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?211+ful+SB1125E+hil
Amendmenthttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?211+amd+SB1125AS
Supplementhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?211+oth+SB1125F122+PDF
Supplementhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?211+oth+SB1125FE122+PDF
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?211+vot+S09V0004+SB1125
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?211+vot+S05V0077+SB1125
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?211+vot+SV0161SB1125+SB1125
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?211+vot+SV0193SB1125+SB1125
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?211+vot+SV0197SB1125+SB1125
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?211+vot+SV0198SB1125+SB1125

Bill Comments 750

feedback