VA SB1122 | 2021 | 1st Special Session

Note: Carryover of previous SB1122

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on March 31 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-31 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0463)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Habitual offenders; repeal. Repeals the remaining provisions of the Habitual Offender Act. The bill also requires that the Commissioner of the Department of Motor Vehicles reinstate a person's privilege to drive a motor vehicle that was suspended or revoked solely on the basis that such person was determined to be or adjudicated a habitual offender pursuant to the Habitual Offender Act. The bill also authorizes the Virginia Alcohol and Safety Action Program to continue to administer intervention for individuals who were ordered to attend an intervention interview on or before June 30, 2021. Habitual offenders; repeal. Repeals the remaining provisions of the Habitual Offender Act. The bill also requires that the Commissioner of the Department of Motor Vehicles reinstate a person's privilege to drive a motor vehicle that was suspended or revoked solely on the basis that such person was determined to be or adjudicated a habitual offender pursuant to the Habitual Offender Act. The bill also authorizes the Virginia Alcohol and Safety Action Program to continue to administer intervention for individuals who were ordered to attend an intervention interview on or before June 30, 2021.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Habitual offenders; repeals remaining provisions of Habitual Offender Act.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-02-17 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (79-Y 20-N) (Y: 79 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-12 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice (19-Y 3-N) (Y: 19 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-10 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (7-Y 1-N) (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-25 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (26-Y 13-N) (Y: 26 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-25 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-25 - Senate - Senate: Engrossment reconsidered by Senate (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-19 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-01-18 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Judiciary with substitute (10-Y 4-N) (Y: 10 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-03-31 Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0463)
2021-03-31 Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 463 (effective 7/1/21)
2021-02-24 Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., March 31, 2021
2021-02-24SenateEnrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on February 24, 2021
2021-02-22SenateSigned by President
2021-02-19HouseSigned by Speaker
2021-02-19SenateBill text as passed Senate and House (SB1122ER)
2021-02-19SenateEnrolled
2021-02-17HouseVOTE: Passage (79-Y 20-N)
2021-02-17HousePassed House (79-Y 20-N)
2021-02-17HouseRead third time
2021-02-16HouseRead second time
2021-02-12HouseReported from Courts of Justice (19-Y 3-N)
2021-02-10HouseSubcommittee recommends reporting (7-Y 1-N)
2021-02-09HouseAssigned Courts sub: Criminal
2021-02-08HouseContinued to Special Session 1 in Courts of Justice by voice vote
2021-02-02HouseReferred to Committee for Courts of Justice
2021-02-02HouseRead first time
2021-02-02HousePlaced on Calendar
2021-01-25SenatePrinted as engrossed 21103177D-ES1
2021-01-25SenatePassed Senate (26-Y 13-N)
2021-01-25SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
2021-01-25SenateEngrossed by Senate - committee substitute with amendment SB1122ES1
2021-01-25SenateAmendment by Senator Stanley agreed to
2021-01-25SenateReading of amendment waived
2021-01-25SenateEngrossment reconsidered by Senate (39-Y 0-N)
2021-01-22SenatePassed by for the day
2021-01-21SenatePassed by for the day
2021-01-20SenateEngrossed by Senate - committee substitute SB1122S1
2021-01-20SenateCommittee substitute agreed to 21103177D-S1
2021-01-20SenateReading of substitute waived
2021-01-20SenateRead second time
2021-01-19SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N)
2021-01-18SenateCommittee substitute printed 21103177D-S1
2021-01-18SenateReported from Judiciary with substitute (10-Y 4-N)
2020-12-22SenateReferred to Committee on the Judiciary
2020-12-22SenatePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/13/21 21100838D

Same As/Similar To

SB1122 (Carry Over) 2021-02-08 - Continued to Special Session 1 in Courts of Justice by voice vote

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
161305(n/a)See Bill Text
16177(n/a)See Bill Text
171213(n/a)See Bill Text
192389(n/a)See Bill Text
462301(n/a)See Bill Text
462301.1(n/a)See Bill Text
462301.2(n/a)See Bill Text
462355.1(n/a)See Bill Text
462363(n/a)See Bill Text
462411(n/a)See Bill Text
53121(n/a)See Bill Text
801407(n/a)See Bill Text
8019(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+sum+SB1122
Texthttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+ful+SB1122+hil
Texthttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+ful+SB1122S1+hil
Texthttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+ful+SB1122ES1+hil
Texthttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+ful+SB1122ER+hil
Texthttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+ful+CHAP0463+hil
Amendmenthttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+amd+SB1122AS
Supplementhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+oth+SB1122FES1122+PDF
Supplementhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+oth+SB1122FER122+PDF
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+vot+S03C0041+SB1122
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+vot+SC0038SB1122+SB1122
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+vot+SC0090SB1122+SB1122
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+vot+SC0091SB1122+SB1122
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+vot+SC0092SB1122+SB1122
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+vot+H0801V0008+SB1122
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+vot+H08V0010+SB1122
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+vot+HV1642+SB1122

Bill Comments

feedback