VA SB1113 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 28 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-03-28 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0751)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 28 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-03-28 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0751)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Unemployment compensation; Social Security offset. Eliminates the requirement that unemployment compensation benefits be reduced by 50 percent of the amount of the claimant's Social Security Act or Railroad Retirement Act retirement benefits in years when the solvency level of the unemployment trust fund is less than 50 percent. Currently, such a reduction in unemployment benefits is not required in years when the solvency level of the unemployment trust fund exceeds 50 percent.
Title
Unemployment compensation; eliminates requirement that certain benefits be reduced by 50 percent.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-02-11 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (96-Y 0-N) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-08 - House - House: Reported from Commerce and Labor (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-01-21 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (35-Y 0-N) (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-01-21 - Senate - Senate: Reconsideration of passage agreed to by Senate (35-Y 0-N) (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-01-21 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (35-Y 0-N) (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-01-19 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-01-17 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Commerce and Labor (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-08 - House - House: Reported from Commerce and Labor (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-01-21 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (35-Y 0-N) (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-01-21 - Senate - Senate: Reconsideration of passage agreed to by Senate (35-Y 0-N) (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-01-21 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (35-Y 0-N) (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-01-19 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-01-17 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Commerce and Labor (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-03-28 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0751) | |
2011-03-28 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 751 (effective 7/1/11) | |
2011-02-16 | Senate: Signed by President | |
2011-02-15 | House: Signed by Speaker | |
2011-02-15 | Senate: Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB1113ER) | |
2011-02-15 | Senate: Enrolled | |
2011-02-11 | House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (96-Y 0-N) | |
2011-02-11 | House: Passed House BLOCK VOTE (96-Y 0-N) | |
2011-02-11 | House: Read third time | |
2011-02-10 | House: Read second time | |
2011-02-08 | House: Reported from Commerce and Labor (21-Y 0-N) | |
2011-02-07 | House: Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor | |
2011-02-07 | House: Read first time | |
2011-02-07 | House: Placed on Calendar | |
2011-01-21 | Senate: Passed Senate (35-Y 0-N) | |
2011-01-21 | Senate: Reconsideration of passage agreed to by Senate (35-Y 0-N) | |
2011-01-21 | Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (35-Y 0-N) | |
2011-01-20 | Senate: Read second time and engrossed | |
2011-01-19 | Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) | |
2011-01-17 | Senate: Reported from Commerce and Labor (14-Y 0-N) | |
2011-01-11 | Senate: Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor | |
2011-01-11 | Senate: Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/12/11 11100867D |