VA SB1109 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Engrossed on January 17 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-19 - Left in General Laws
Pending: House General Laws Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on January 17 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-19 - Left in General Laws
Pending: House General Laws Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Virginia Fair Housing Law; unlawful discriminatory housing practices; sexual orientation and gender identity. Adds discrimination on the basis of an individual's sexual orientation or gender identity as an unlawful housing practice. The bill defines sexual orientation and "gender identity".
Title
Virginia Fair Housing Law; unlawful discriminatory housing practices, etc.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-01-18 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (31-Y 9-N) (Y: 31 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-18 - Senate - Senate: Reconsideration of passage agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-18 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (33-Y 7-N) (Y: 33 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-16 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-14 - Senate - Senate: Reported from General Laws and Technology with substitute (13-Y 1-N) (Y: 13 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-14 - Senate - Senate: Reported from General Laws and Technology (13-Y 1-N) (Y: 13 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-18 - Senate - Senate: Reconsideration of passage agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-18 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (33-Y 7-N) (Y: 33 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-16 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-14 - Senate - Senate: Reported from General Laws and Technology with substitute (13-Y 1-N) (Y: 13 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-14 - Senate - Senate: Reported from General Laws and Technology (13-Y 1-N) (Y: 13 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-19 | House | Left in General Laws |
2019-02-12 | House | Referred to Committee on General Laws |
2019-02-12 | House | Referred from Rules by voice vote |
2019-01-22 | House | Referred to Committee on Rules |
2019-01-22 | House | Read first time |
2019-01-22 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2019-01-18 | Senate | Passed Senate (31-Y 9-N) |
2019-01-18 | Senate | Reconsideration of passage agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2019-01-18 | Senate | Read third time and passed Senate (33-Y 7-N) |
2019-01-17 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute SB1109S1 |
2019-01-17 | Senate | Committee substitute agreed to 19104889D-S1 |
2019-01-17 | Senate | Reading of substitute waived |
2019-01-17 | Senate | Read second time |
2019-01-16 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2019-01-14 | Senate | Incorporates SB1232 (Ebbin) |
2019-01-14 | Senate | Committee substitute printed 19104889D-S1 |
2019-01-14 | Senate | Reported from General Laws and Technology with substitute (13-Y 1-N) |
2018-12-21 | Senate | Referred to Committee on General Laws and Technology |
2018-12-21 | Senate | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/19 19102390D |