VA SB1100 | 2021 | 1st Special Session
Note: Carry Over of previous SB1100
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on December 16 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-01 - Left in Appropriations
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Status: Introduced on December 16 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-01 - Left in Appropriations
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Summary
Budget Bill. Amends Chapter 56 of the Acts of Assembly, 2020 Special Session I. Budget Bill. Amends Chapter 56 of the Acts of Assembly, 2020 Special Session I.
Title
Budget Bill.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-02-12 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (31-Y 8-N) (Y: 31 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-12 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-11 - Senate - Senate: Motion for Special and Continuing Order at the end of Senate Calendar on February 12 (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-10 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance and Appropriations with amendments (16-Y 0-N) (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-05 - Senate - Senate: Continued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in Finance and Appropriations (16-Y 0-N) (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-12 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-11 - Senate - Senate: Motion for Special and Continuing Order at the end of Senate Calendar on February 12 (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-10 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance and Appropriations with amendments (16-Y 0-N) (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-05 - Senate - Senate: Continued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in Finance and Appropriations (16-Y 0-N) (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-01 | House | Left in Appropriations |
2021-02-13 | House | Referred to Committee on Appropriations |
2021-02-13 | House | Read first time |
2021-02-13 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2021-02-12 | Senate | Passed Senate (31-Y 8-N) |
2021-02-12 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) |
2021-02-12 | Senate | Contested committee amendment agreed to (P.48 Item 196#1) |
2021-02-12 | Senate | Contested committee amendment agreed to (P.26 Item 135#2) |
2021-02-12 | Senate | Contested committee amendment agreed to (P.25 Item 135#1) |
2021-02-12 | Senate | Contested committee amendment agreed to (P.23 Item 130#2) |
2021-02-12 | Senate | Contested committee amendment agreed to (P.23 Item 130#1) |
2021-02-12 | Senate | Contested committee amendment agreed to (P.16 Item 112#2) |
2021-02-12 | Senate | Contested committee amendment agreed to (P.16 Item 112#1) |
2021-02-12 | Senate | Contested committee amendment agreed to (P.15 Item 105#1) |
2021-02-12 | Senate | Contested committee amendment agreed to (P.10 Item 73#2) |
2021-02-12 | Senate | Contested committee amendment agreed to (P.10 Item 73#1) |
2021-02-12 | Senate | Contested committee amendment agreed to (P.9 Item 57#1) |
2021-02-12 | Senate | Contested committee amendment agreed to (P.8 Item 48#3) |
2021-02-12 | Senate | Contested committee amendment agreed to (P.8 Item 48#2) |
2021-02-12 | Senate | Contested committee amendment agreed to (P.7 Item 43#1) |
2021-02-12 | Senate | Contested committee amendment agreed to (P.7 Item 42#1) |
2021-02-12 | Senate | Contested committee amendment agreed to (P.6 Item 41#1) |
2021-02-12 | Senate | Contested committee amendment agreed to (P.6 Item 40#1) |
2021-02-12 | Senate | Contested committee amendment agreed to (P.3 Item 9#1) |
2021-02-12 | Senate | Uncontested Committee amendments agreed to |
2021-02-12 | Senate | Read second time |
2021-02-11 | Senate | Passed by for the day |
2021-02-11 | Senate | Motion for Special and Continuing Order at the end of Senate Calendar on February 12 (39-Y 0-N) |
2021-02-11 | Senate | Read second time |
2021-02-10 | Senate | Read first time |
2021-02-10 | Senate | Reported from Finance and Appropriations with amendments (16-Y 0-N) |
2021-02-05 | Senate | Continued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in Finance and Appropriations (16-Y 0-N) |
2021-01-20 | Senate | Member Budget amendments available |
2020-12-16 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Finance and Appropriations |
2020-12-16 | Senate | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/13/21 21102290D |
Same As/Similar To
SB1100 (Carry Over) 2021-02-05 - Continued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in Finance and Appropriations (16-Y 0-N)