VA SB110 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 25 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-25 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0470)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 25 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-25 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0470)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Research and development tax credits; sunset; aggregate caps. Extends the sunset date for both the research and development expenses tax credit and the major research and development expenses tax credit from January 1, 2022, to January 1, 2025. Beginning with taxable year 2021, the bill increases the aggregate cap of the research and development expenses tax credit from $7 million to $7.77 million and increases the aggregate cap of the major research and development expenses tax credit from $20 million to $24 million. For both credits, the bill moves back the annual deadline for applications for the credit from July 1 to September 1.
Title
Research and development tax credits; extends sunset date, aggregate caps.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-02 - Senate - Senate: Conference report agreed to by Senate (38-Y 2-N) (Y: 38 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-28 - House - House: VOTE: Adoption (87-Y 10-N) (Y: 87 N: 10 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-24 - Senate - Senate: Senate acceded to request (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-19 - Senate - Senate: House substitute rejected by Senate (2-Y 35-N) (Y: 2 N: 35 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2020-02-17 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (94-Y 6-N) (Y: 94 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-12 - House - House: Reported from Finance with substitute (21-Y 1-N) (Y: 21 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-03 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (39-Y 1-N) (Y: 39 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-30 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (37-Y 0-N) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-29 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance and Appropriations with substitute (13-Y 1-N) (Y: 13 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-28 - House - House: VOTE: Adoption (87-Y 10-N) (Y: 87 N: 10 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-24 - Senate - Senate: Senate acceded to request (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-19 - Senate - Senate: House substitute rejected by Senate (2-Y 35-N) (Y: 2 N: 35 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2020-02-17 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (94-Y 6-N) (Y: 94 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-12 - House - House: Reported from Finance with substitute (21-Y 1-N) (Y: 21 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-03 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (39-Y 1-N) (Y: 39 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-30 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (37-Y 0-N) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-29 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance and Appropriations with substitute (13-Y 1-N) (Y: 13 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-25 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0470) | |
2020-03-25 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 470 (effective 7/1/20) | |
2020-03-12 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., April 11, 2020 | |
2020-03-12 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on March 12, 2020 |
2020-03-08 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2020-03-07 | Senate | Signed by President |
2020-03-07 | Senate | Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB110ER) |
2020-03-07 | Senate | Enrolled |
2020-03-02 | Senate | Conference report agreed to by Senate (38-Y 2-N) |
2020-02-28 | House | VOTE: Adoption (87-Y 10-N) |
2020-02-28 | House | Conference report agreed to by House (87-Y 10-N) |
2020-02-27 | Conference: Amended by conference committee | |
2020-02-25 | House | Delegates: Jones, Keam, Ware |
2020-02-25 | House | Conferees appointed by House |
2020-02-24 | Senate | Senators: Howell, Saslaw, Newman |
2020-02-24 | Senate | Conferees appointed by Senate |
2020-02-24 | Senate | Senate acceded to request (40-Y 0-N) |
2020-02-20 | House | House requested conference committee |
2020-02-20 | House | House insisted on substitute |
2020-02-19 | Senate | House substitute rejected by Senate (2-Y 35-N) |
2020-02-17 | House | VOTE: Passage (94-Y 6-N) |
2020-02-17 | House | Passed House with substitute (96-Y 6-N) |
2020-02-17 | House | Engrossed by House - committee substitute SB110H1 |
2020-02-17 | House | Committee substitute agreed to 20108185D-H1 |
2020-02-17 | House | Read third time |
2020-02-14 | House | Read second time |
2020-02-12 | House | Committee substitute printed 20108185D-H1 |
2020-02-12 | House | Reported from Finance with substitute (21-Y 1-N) |
2020-02-12 | House | Referred to Committee on Finance |
2020-02-12 | House | Read first time |
2020-02-12 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2020-02-03 | Senate | Read third time and passed Senate (39-Y 1-N) |
2020-01-31 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute SB110S1 |
2020-01-31 | Senate | Committee substitute agreed to 20106804D-S1 |
2020-01-31 | Senate | Reading of substitute waived |
2020-01-31 | Senate | Read second time |
2020-01-30 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (37-Y 0-N) |
2020-01-29 | Senate | Committee substitute printed 20106804D-S1 |
2020-01-29 | Senate | Reported from Finance and Appropriations with substitute (13-Y 1-N) |
2020-01-08 | Senate | Moved from Finance to Finance and Appropriations due to a change of the committee name |
2019-12-12 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Finance and Appropriations |
2019-12-12 | Senate | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/20 20101366D |
Same As/Similar To
HB748 (Same As) 2020-03-25 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0469)
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
58 | 1 | 439.12:08 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
58 | 1 | 439.12:11 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |