VA SB1098 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 23 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-03-23 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0419)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 23 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-03-23 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0419)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Advisory Committee on Juvenile Justice and Prevention. Broadens the scope of the Advisory Committee on Juvenile Justice to include review of juvenile delinquency prevention activities in the Commonwealth. The bill also adds the Commissioner of Health to the membership of the Advisory Committee and provides that the Advisory Committee may serve as an advisory committee as may be required by other federal or state laws or programs administered by the Department of Criminal Justice Services.
Title
Juvenile Justice and Prevention, Advisory Committee on; delinquency prevention.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-02-24 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 101 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-20 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-16 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (10-Y 0-N) (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-06 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (37-Y 0-N) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-06 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-05 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-04 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-02 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (13-Y 0-N) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-20 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-16 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (10-Y 0-N) (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-06 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (37-Y 0-N) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-06 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-05 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-04 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-02 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (13-Y 0-N) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-23 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0419) | |
2015-03-23 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 419 (effective 7/1/15) | |
2015-03-04 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, Sunday, March 29, 2015 | |
2015-03-04 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on 3/4/15 |
2015-02-27 | Senate | Signed by President |
2015-02-27 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2015-02-27 | Senate | Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB1098ER) |
2015-02-27 | Senate | Enrolled |
2015-02-24 | House | VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) |
2015-02-24 | House | Passed House BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N) |
2015-02-24 | House | Read third time |
2015-02-23 | House | Read second time |
2015-02-20 | House | Reported from Courts of Justice (21-Y 0-N) |
2015-02-16 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting (10-Y 0-N) |
2015-02-10 | House | Assigned Courts sub: Criminal Law |
2015-02-10 | House | Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice |
2015-02-10 | House | Read first time |
2015-02-10 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2015-02-06 | Senate | Passed Senate (37-Y 0-N) |
2015-02-06 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) |
2015-02-06 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute SB1098S1 |
2015-02-06 | Senate | Committee substitute agreed to 15104609D-S1 |
2015-02-06 | Senate | Reading of substitute waived |
2015-02-06 | Senate | Read second time |
2015-02-05 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) |
2015-02-04 | Senate | Reported from Finance (14-Y 0-N) |
2015-02-02 | Senate | Rereferred to Finance |
2015-02-02 | Senate | Committee substitute printed 15104609D-S1 |
2015-02-02 | Senate | Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (13-Y 0-N) |
2015-01-13 | Senate | Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice |
2015-01-13 | Senate | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/14/15 15101594D |