VA SB1078 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 22 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-02-22 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0049)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 22 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-02-22 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0049)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
State Board for Community Colleges; mental health policies. Requires the State Board for Community Colleges to develop a mental health referral policy that would require community colleges to designate at least one individual at each college to serve as a point of contact with an emergency services system clinician at a local community services board, or another qualified mental health services provider, for screenings and referrals of students who may have emergency or urgent mental health needs.
Title
Community Colleges, State Board for; Board shall develop mental health referral policies, etc.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-02-08 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (97-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-06 - House - House: Reported from Education (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-29 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-29 - Senate - Senate: Reconsideration of passage agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-29 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-25 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-24 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health with amendments (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-06 - House - House: Reported from Education (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-29 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-29 - Senate - Senate: Reconsideration of passage agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-29 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-25 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-24 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health with amendments (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-02-22 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0049) | |
2013-02-22 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 49 (effective 7/1/13) | |
2013-02-13 | Senate | Signed by President |
2013-02-12 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2013-02-12 | Senate | Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB1078ER) |
2013-02-12 | Senate | Enrolled |
2013-02-08 | House | VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (97-Y 0-N) |
2013-02-08 | House | Passed House BLOCK VOTE (97-Y 0-N) |
2013-02-08 | House | Read third time |
2013-02-07 | House | Read second time |
2013-02-06 | House | Reported from Education (21-Y 0-N) |
2013-02-02 | House | Referred to Committee on Education |
2013-02-02 | House | Read first time |
2013-02-02 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2013-01-29 | Senate | Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2013-01-29 | Senate | Reconsideration of passage agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2013-01-29 | Senate | Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2013-01-28 | Senate | Printed as engrossed 13103585D-E |
2013-01-28 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate as amended SB1078E |
2013-01-28 | Senate | Committee amendments agreed to |
2013-01-28 | Senate | Reading of amendments waived |
2013-01-28 | Senate | Read second time |
2013-01-25 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2013-01-24 | Senate | Reported from Education and Health with amendments (14-Y 0-N) |
2013-01-15 | Senate | Assigned Education sub: Higher Education |
2013-01-09 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Education and Health |
2013-01-09 | Senate | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/13 13103585D |
Same As/Similar To
HB2322 (Same As) 2013-03-20 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0606)
Subjects
Behavioral Health and Developmental Services, Department of
Commissions, Boards, and Institutions Generally
Educational Institutions
Commissions, Boards, and Institutions Generally
Educational Institutions