VA SB1076 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 11 2020 - 50% progression
Action: 2020-03-03 - Left in Appropriations
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]

Summary

Property conveyance; Governor; Chickahominy Indian Tribe. Authorizes the Governor to purchase, in a form approved by the Attorney General and for an amount of up to $2.5 million, land located in Charles City County for the purpose of conveyance to the Chickahominy Indian Tribe.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Chickahominy Indian Tribe; property conveyance by Governor.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-02-28 - House - House: Reported from Counties, Cities and Towns (17-Y 5-N) (Y: 17 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-20 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (6-Y 1-N) (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-11 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (38-Y 1-N 1-A) (Y: 37 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-02-11 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-10 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (36-Y 0-N) (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-06 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance and Appropriations with substitute (15-Y 0-N 1-A) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-01-27 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Judiciary (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-03HouseLeft in Appropriations
2020-02-28HouseReferred to Committee on Appropriations
2020-02-28HouseReported from Counties, Cities and Towns (17-Y 5-N)
2020-02-20HouseSubcommittee recommends referring to Committee on Appropriations
2020-02-20HouseSubcommittee recommends reporting (6-Y 1-N)
2020-02-18HouseAssigned CC & T sub: Charters
2020-02-14HouseReferred to Committee on Counties, Cities and Towns
2020-02-14HouseRead first time
2020-02-14HousePlaced on Calendar
2020-02-11SenatePassed Senate (38-Y 1-N 1-A)
2020-02-11SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
2020-02-11SenateEngrossed by Senate - committee substitute SB1076S1
2020-02-11SenateCommittee substitute agreed to 20107605D-S1
2020-02-11SenateReading of substitute waived
2020-02-11SenateRead second time
2020-02-10SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (36-Y 0-N)
2020-02-06SenateCommittee substitute printed 20107605D-S1
2020-02-06SenateReported from Finance and Appropriations with substitute (15-Y 0-N 1-A)
2020-01-27SenateRereferred to Finance and Appropriations
2020-01-27SenateReported from Judiciary (15-Y 0-N)
2020-01-17SenateReferred to Committee on the Judiciary
2020-01-17SenatePresented and ordered printed 20104323D

Virginia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback