VA SB1052 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 3 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-04-03 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0784)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 3 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-04-03 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0784)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Revising and recodifying the laws pertaining to wills, trusts, and fiduciaries. Reinserts language that was inadvertently omitted from Chapter 614 of the Acts of Assembly of 2012, which created Title 64.2. The bill contains an emergency clause and provides that it is effective retroactively to the date Title 64.2 took effect. This bill is a recommendation of the Virginia Code Commission.
Title
Wills, trusts, and fiduciaries; revises and recodifies laws. Emergency.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-04-03 - House - House: VOTE: ADOPTION EMERGENCY (98-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-03 - Senate - Senate: Senate concurred in Governor's recommendation (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-14 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N) (Y: 102 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-11 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice (17-Y 0-N) (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-08 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (7-Y 0-N) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-17 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-15 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-14 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Courts of Justice (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-03 - Senate - Senate: Senate concurred in Governor's recommendation (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-14 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N) (Y: 102 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-11 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice (17-Y 0-N) (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-08 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (7-Y 0-N) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-17 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-15 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-14 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Courts of Justice (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-04-03 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0784) | |
2013-04-03 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 784 (effective 10/1/12) | |
2013-04-03 | House | Signed by Speaker as reenrolled |
2013-04-03 | Senate | Signed by President as reenrolled |
2013-04-03 | Senate | Reenrolled bill text (SB1052ER2) |
2013-04-03 | Senate | Reenrolled |
2013-04-03 | Governor: Governor's recommendation adopted | |
2013-04-03 | House | VOTE: ADOPTION EMERGENCY (98-Y 0-N) |
2013-04-03 | House | House concurred in Governor's recommendation (98-Y 0-N) |
2013-04-03 | Senate | Senate concurred in Governor's recommendation (40-Y 0-N) |
2013-04-02 | Senate | Placed on Calendar |
2013-03-05 | Senate | Governor's recommendation received by Senate |
2013-02-20 | Senate | Signed by President |
2013-02-19 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2013-02-19 | Senate | Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB1052ER) |
2013-02-19 | Senate | Enrolled |
2013-02-14 | House | VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N) |
2013-02-14 | House | Passed House BLOCK VOTE (100-Y 0-N) |
2013-02-14 | House | Read third time |
2013-02-13 | House | Read second time |
2013-02-11 | House | Reported from Courts of Justice (17-Y 0-N) |
2013-02-08 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting (7-Y 0-N) |
2013-02-07 | House | Assigned Courts sub: #2 Civil |
2013-01-25 | House | Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice |
2013-01-25 | House | Read first time |
2013-01-25 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2013-01-17 | Senate | Read third time and passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) |
2013-01-16 | Senate | Read second time and engrossed |
2013-01-15 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2013-01-14 | Senate | Reported from Courts of Justice (15-Y 0-N) |
2013-01-08 | Senate | Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice |
2013-01-08 | Senate | Prefiled and ordered printed with emergency clause; offered 01/09/13 13100646D |