VA SB1050 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 16 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-03-16 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0221)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 16 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-03-16 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0221)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Military and emergency laws; obsolete provisions. Repeals provisions of Title 44 deemed obsolete by the Code Commission. Provisions related to the Naval Militia are repealed as no evidence of the existence of the Naval Militia in Virginia can be found. The bill repeals other provisions related to ancient privileges retained by the Corps, authority of the Adjutant General to adopt a seal, provision of health insurance that is supplied elsewhere, and use of armories. An unused section requiring a loyalty oath by persons employed or associated with an emergency services organization is repealed. Also repealed are several wartime-specific provisions enacted during World War II, including provisions dealing with air raid precautions, issuing agents for the sale of obligations of the United States, health and sanitation rules, and acquisition of motor vehicle tires and a 1944 provision regarding powers of attorney and agency agreements that expired six months after the end of World War II. This bill is a recommendation of the Virginia Code Commission.
Title
Military and emergency laws; repeals obsolete provisions.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-02-18 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 101 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-13 - House - House: Reported from Militia, Police and Public Safety (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-23 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-21 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-19 - Senate - Senate: Reported from General Laws and Technology (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-13 - House - House: Reported from Militia, Police and Public Safety (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-23 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-21 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-19 - Senate - Senate: Reported from General Laws and Technology (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-16 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0221) | |
2015-03-16 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 221 (effective 7/1/15) | |
2015-02-25 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, Sunday, March 29, 2015 | |
2015-02-25 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on 2/25/15 |
2015-02-24 | Senate | Signed by President |
2015-02-23 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2015-02-23 | Senate | Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB1050ER) |
2015-02-23 | Senate | Enrolled |
2015-02-18 | House | VOTE: PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) |
2015-02-18 | House | Passed House (99-Y 0-N) |
2015-02-18 | House | Read third time |
2015-02-17 | House | Passed by for the day |
2015-02-16 | House | Read second time |
2015-02-13 | House | Reported from Militia, Police and Public Safety (21-Y 0-N) |
2015-01-30 | House | Referred to Committee on Militia, Police and Public Safety |
2015-01-30 | House | Read first time |
2015-01-30 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2015-01-23 | Senate | Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2015-01-22 | Senate | Read second time and engrossed |
2015-01-21 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) |
2015-01-19 | Senate | Reported from General Laws and Technology (14-Y 0-N) |
2015-01-12 | Senate | Referred to Committee on General Laws and Technology |
2015-01-12 | Senate | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/14/15 15101206D |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
18 | 2 | 308 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
2 | 2 | 2905 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
46 | 2 | 827 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
65 | 2 | 101 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
65 | 2 | 103 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
8 | 01 | 327.2 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |