VA SB1043 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on March 10 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-03-10 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0089)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on March 10 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-03-10 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0089)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Bonds for institutions of higher education. Authorizes issuance of bonds in an amount up to $67,500,000 for revenue-producing capital projects at institutions of higher education. The bill has an emergency clause and is effective upon passage.
Title
Bonds for institutions of higher education.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-02-13 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE EMERGENCY (95-Y 1-N) (Y: 97 N: 1 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-11 - House - House: Reported from Appropriations (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-30 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-28 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-27 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-11 - House - House: Reported from Appropriations (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-30 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-28 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-27 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-10 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0089) | |
2015-03-10 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 89 (effective 3/10/15) | |
2015-02-23 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, Sunday, March 29, 2015 | |
2015-02-23 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on 2/23/15 |
2015-02-20 | Senate | Signed by President |
2015-02-17 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2015-02-17 | Senate | Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB1043ER) |
2015-02-17 | Senate | Enrolled |
2015-02-13 | House | VOTE: PASSAGE EMERGENCY (95-Y 1-N) |
2015-02-13 | House | Passed House (95-Y 1-N) |
2015-02-13 | House | Read third time |
2015-02-12 | House | Read second time |
2015-02-11 | House | Reported from Appropriations (22-Y 0-N) |
2015-02-09 | House | Assigned App. sub: General Government & Capital Outlay |
2015-02-06 | House | Referred to Committee on Appropriations |
2015-02-06 | House | Read first time |
2015-02-06 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2015-01-30 | Senate | Read third time and passed Senate (38-Y 0-N) |
2015-01-29 | Senate | Read second time and engrossed |
2015-01-28 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) |
2015-01-27 | Senate | Reported from Finance (15-Y 0-N) |
2015-01-12 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Finance |
2015-01-12 | Senate | Prefiled and ordered printed with emergency clause; offered 01/14/15 15101912D |
Same As/Similar To
HB1892 (Same As) 2015-03-10 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0067)